Global Patent Index - EP 1097801 A1

EP 1097801 A1 2001-05-09 - Piezoelectric press drive with hydraulic transmission device

Title (en)

Piezoelectric press drive with hydraulic transmission device

Title (de)

Piezoelektrischer Pressenantrieb mit hydraulischer Übertragungsanordnung

Title (fr)

Entraînement piézoélectrique de presse avec dispositif de transmission hydraulique

Publication

EP 1097801 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00123428 A

Priority

DE 19953244 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to a press, more particularly for cutting and moulding miniature components, with a reciprocating die (9). In order to provide a small and compact press, which can be economically manufactured, the drive of the die (9) is effected by at least one piezoactor (18, 19). In addition, a more particularly hydraulic transmission device (14) is arranged between the piezoactor (18, 19) and the die (9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B30B 1/00; H01L 41/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/00 (2006.01); H02N 2/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 1/007 (2013.01); B30B 1/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097801 A1 20010509; DE 19953244 A1 20010517

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060131

2004-10-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040820

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010615

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI