Global Patent Index - EP 1097852 A1

EP 1097852 A1 2001-05-09 - Bogie for railway freight wagons with radial self-steerable wheel-sets

Title (en)

Bogie for railway freight wagons with radial self-steerable wheel-sets

Title (de)

Drehgestell für Eisenbahngüterwagen mit radial selbstlenkenden Radsätzen

Title (fr)

Bogie pour wagons à trains de roues auto-orientables radialement

Publication

EP 1097852 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99121651 A

Priority

EP 99121651 A

Abstract (en)

Self steerable bogie for a railway freight wagon, comprising two or more axles (1) provided with wheels (20). Each axle is fitted in a wheel set or axle guiding system (3), vertically suspendedly movable due to vertical load and vertical irregularities emanating from a track while the bogie is in motion, and horisontally to a smaller extent, within the limits of a longitudinal play(e), both in relation to a bogie frame (4). Between said frame (4) and said guiding system (3) is a primary suspension, having two springs or sets of springs (5) arranged vertically at each side of and at each wheel (20) of said guiding system (3). Both springs or sets of springs (5) is connected to a friction dampening arrangement (6, 7, 8, 9) providing a dampening friction force to the suspension movement of the wheel-set guiding system (3). This is achieved by eliminating said longitudinal play (e) between the guiding system (3) and the bogie frame (4) whereby an elastic steerability of the axles which is proportional to vertical load on the bogie is reached by allowing a load dependent elastic movement in the direction of the tangent to the travelling direction of the freight wagon of each wheel-set, amounting to a maximum of (+/- e). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B61F 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B61F 5/301 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 4674412 A 19870623 - MULCAHY HARRY W [US], et al

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097852 A1 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [R18D] EP-APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN: (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20030502

2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030503

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021021

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 20010623

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010623

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI