Global Patent Index - EP 1097871 A1

EP 1097871 A1 2001-05-09 - Labelling device

Title (en)

Labelling device

Title (de)

Etikettiermaschine

Title (fr)

Machine d'étiquetage

Publication

EP 1097871 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00114736 A

Priority

DE 19953255 A

Abstract (en)

The machine consists of its base (1) which carries the drive and control devices as well as the rotary table (1). In the vicinity of the table or its periphery are arranged one or more adapter positions (2) each with a standard interface (3). In these positions one or more identical and/or different labelling stations (A-C) can be docked. These can contain the necessary coupling or drive systems required for docking

Abstract (de)

Etikettiermaschine für Gegenstände, insbesondere Gefäße und dergleichen, bestehend aus einem Maschinenunterbau mit einem Antrieb für einen mit Standtellern für die zu etikettierenden Gegenstände bestückten Drehtisch sowie mit dem Maschinenunterbau verbundenen Etikettierstationen zum Anbringen der Etiketten auf die Gegenstände. Bei einer solchen Etikettiermaschine ist an der Peripherie mindestens eine Adapterstelle mit einer Standardschnittstelle angeordnet, an welcher gleiche und/oder verschiedenartige Etikettierstationen andockbar sind. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/14 (2006.01); B65C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/14 (2013.01); B65C 9/00 (2013.01); B65C 9/0062 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097871 A1 20010509; BR 0005237 A 20010619; DE 19953255 A1 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040608

2004-03-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040126

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: FR GB IT NL

2001-08-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI