Global Patent Index - EP 1097873 A2

EP 1097873 A2 2001-05-09 - Package for electric components

Title (en)

Package for electric components

Title (de)

Behälter zur Verpackung von elektrischen Bauelementen

Title (fr)

Emballage pour des composants électriques

Publication

EP 1097873 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00124110 A

Priority

DE 19953600 A

Abstract (en)

The container comprises a parallelepiped shaped folded cardboard tube, with side walls separated by a distance corresponding to the width of the components (3). A base wall is provided opposite protrusions (32) from the components. A carrier rail (2) is provided along the length of the tube on the base wall. The carrier rail is also folded from cardboard and includes at least one upright (22,23) on which the components rest.

Abstract (de)

Der erfindungsgemäße Behälter zur Aufnahme von Stückgütern, insbesondere von elektrischen Bauelementen, besteht aus einer rohrförmigen, aus Pappkarton gefalteten Hülle (1) und einer auf einer Bodenwand der Hülle angeordneten Trageschiene (2), welche ebenfalls aus Pappkarton gefaltet ist. Die Trageschiene ist in Längsrichtung auf der Bodenwand (15) der Hülle (1) verschiebbar und besitzt beiderseits aufgebogene Rippen (22,23), welche jeweils die Bodenseite (31) der Stückgüter (3) abstützen. Damit können Stückgüter, wie elektrische Bauelemente mit empfindlichen Anschlußstiften, sicher vor Beschädigung mittels der Tragescniene in die Hülle eingeschoben und ohne Gefahr des Verkantens transportiert werden. Der Behälter ist besonders kostengünstig in der Herstellung und umweltfreundlich in der Entsorgung. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 5/38; B65D 5/50; B65D 85/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/38 (2006.01); B65D 5/50 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/38 (2013.01); B65D 5/5045 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 19504365 A1 19950817 - SCHRACK COMPONENTS AG [AT]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097873 A2 20010509; EP 1097873 A3 20030910; EP 1097873 B1 20050309; DE 19953600 A1 20010523; ES 2237375 T3 20050801

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2010-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081107

2010-01-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081106

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081106

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081106

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20071126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-03-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051212

2005-08-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050719

2005-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237375 T3

2005-04-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50009712 P 20050414

2005-04-06 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2005-03-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-03-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: PACKAGE FOR ELECTRIC COMPONENTS

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031229

2004-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI