Global Patent Index - EP 1097879 A2

EP 1097879 A2 2001-05-09 - Top gripping carrier for bottles

Title (en)

Top gripping carrier for bottles

Title (de)

Den Oberteil von Flaschen untergreifender Träger

Title (fr)

Dispositif de transport de bouteilles à préhension par le haut

Publication

EP 1097879 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00204267 A

Priority

  • EP 97938222 A
  • GB 9616889 A

Abstract (en)

An article carrier (10) and a blank for forming an article carrier (10) for securing a plurality of articles, such as bottles, which carrier comprises a base panel (22) having a plurality of apertures (102,104,106) to receive the articles, a pair of handle panels (16/18,26/28), the handle panels being in a face to face relationship with each other and connected to article gripping means, the article gripping means being formed from a pair of outwardly sloping side walls (14/20,24/30) being adapted to form a substantially inverted "V" structure. Each side wall is connected to the base panel (22) along their lower edge and wherein each handle panel extends from the upper edge of each side wall, wherein the article gripping means includes a pair of complementary article receiving apertures (92,108,90,110,94,112) struck from respective ones of the side walls and adapted operatively to engage and retain part of an article and locking means (96) is provided to maintain the handle panels in a face to face relationship. The locking means (96) comprises a locking tab extending from one ofthe handle panels (18) and a complementary portion for receiving and retaining the locking tab struck from the opposed article receiving aperture (108). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 71/48

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/48 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806639 A2 19980219; WO 9806639 A3 19980416; AR 009053 A1 20000308; AT 209146 T 20011215; AT 382021 T 20080115; AU 4060197 A 19980306; DE 69709755 D1 20020221; DE 69709755 T2 20020529; DE 69738422 D1 20080207; DE 69738422 T2 20090102; DK 0921990 T3 20020521; EP 0921990 A2 19990616; EP 0921990 B1 20011121; EP 1097879 A2 20010509; EP 1097879 A3 20010905; EP 1097879 B1 20071226; ES 2168662 T3 20020616; ES 2299418 T3 20080601; GB 9616889 D0 19960925; NO 323818 B1 20070709; NO 990670 A 19990412; NO 990670 D0 19990212; PT 921990 E 20020328; ZA 9706969 B 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69738422

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-04-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140301

2014-03-19 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140301

2013-08-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738422

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738422

- Representative's name: PATRONUS IP PATENT- & RECHTSANWAELTE BERNHARD , DE

2013-07-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738422

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738422

- Representative's name: CORINNA VOSSIUS IP GROUP PATENT- UND RECHTSANW, DE

2013-07-08 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69738422

- Representative's name: PATRONUS IP PATENT- & RECHTSANWAELTE BERNHARD , DE

2013-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20120825

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-11-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100812

2011-10-19 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20111019

2011-07-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100831

2011-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100811

2011-05-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110502

2010-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090827

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080811

2009-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090826

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090817

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080811

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080811

2009-01-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080327

2008-12-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080929

2008-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071226

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080526

2008-08-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071226

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071226

2008-06-25 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2299418 T3

2008-05-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071226

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071226

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20071226

2008-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080326

2008-02-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69738422 P 20080207

2008-01-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-01-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2007-12-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2007-12-26 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0921990 P

2007-12-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2007-07-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-10-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030821

2002-05-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-09-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001129

2001-05-09 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 921990

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI