Global Patent Index - EP 1097880 A1

EP 1097880 A1 2001-05-09 - Sales package for seeds

Title (en)

Sales package for seeds

Title (de)

Verkaufsverpackung für Saatgut

Title (fr)

Emballage de vente pour semences

Publication

EP 1097880 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00124089 A

Priority

  • EP 00124089 A
  • EP 99122238 A

Abstract (en)

Flat, rectangular paper or plastic film packaging container (1), folded from a pre-cut shape and stuck together, has a wide or slit-like opening (10) for hanging. The sides (7, 8) of the container (1) are of essentially the same length and the opening (10) for hanging the container is arranged with its center in one of the corners at the fold line on the bisector of the corner, whereby the area around the opening (10) for hanging is stuck down flat. Preferred features: The part of the packaging container (1) stuck down flat is restricted to the corner.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein flaches, rechteckiges, aus einem vorgefertigten Zuschnitt gefaltetes und verklebtes Verpackungsbehältnis aus Papier oder Kunststoff-Folie für körniges oder granulatförmiges Verpackungsgut, mit einer langloch- oder schlitzförmigen Aufhängeöffnung, insbesondere zur Präsentation von Saatgut, wobei die Seiten (7, 8) des Behältnisses (1) im Wesentlichen gleich lang sind und die Aufhängeöffnung (10) mit ihrem Mittelpunkt im Bereich einer der Behältnisecken an der Faltlinie auf der Winkelhalbierenden der Ecke angeordnet ist. Zur befüllungstechnischen und gebrauchstechnischen Verbesserung ist vorgesehen, dass der Bereich um die Aufnahmeöffnung derart flächig verklebt ist, dass die Aufhängeöffnung innerhalb einer streifenförmigen Klebefläche (111) angeordnet ist, die sich durchgehend über die gesamte Tiefe (t) des Behältnisses erstreckt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 75/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/56 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 75/566 (2013.01); B65D 2575/565 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 29809019 U1 19980903 - DITMAR SCHUMANN GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097880 A1 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-11 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-12-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011018

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI