Global Patent Index - EP 1097884 A1

EP 1097884 A1 2001-05-09 - Device for collecting and selective discharging of at least two kinds of waste, intergrated in a dump truck

Title (en)

Device for collecting and selective discharging of at least two kinds of waste, intergrated in a dump truck

Title (de)

In einen Kipp-Lastwagen intergrierter Vorrichtung zum Sammeln und selektiven Abladen von mindestens zwei Arten von Abfällen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de collecte et de déchargement sélectif d'au moins deux types de déchets, intégré à un camion-benne

Publication

EP 1097884 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402769 A

Priority

FR 9913991 A

Abstract (en)

A tipper lorry comprises a fixed caisson (3) closed by a door (4) articulated to the caisson in its upper part. There is a loading hopper (5) and a compaction system (6). At the location of the hopper are vertical longitudinal partitions (8) which extend to define two distinct compartments in the caisson. A two part retaining system (9) is arranged in the door-caisson transverse separation plane (XX) between one of the caisson compartments (A) and one of the corresponding hopper compartments (B).

Abstract (fr)

Ce dispositif (1) est intégré à un camion-benne (2) qui comprend un caisson fixe (3 ) , fermé par une porte mobile (4) articulée sur le caisson (3) à sa partie supérieure et dans laquelle sont agencés une trémie de chargement (5) et un système de compaction (6). Il se caractérise en ce que le caisson (3) et la porte (4), au niveau de la trémie (5) comportent des cloisons verticales longitudinales (7, 8) situées dans le prolongement l'une de l'autre pour définir deux compartiments distincts dans le caisson (3) qui se prolongent par deux compartiments distincts de chargement au niveau de la trémie (5), au moins un système de retenue en deux parties (9 et 10) étant agencé au niveau d'un plan de séparation transversale (XX) porte(4)-caisson(3) entre l'un des compartiments (A) du caisson (3) et l'un des compartiments correspondant (B) de la trémie (5 ) de la porte (4), qui sont destinés à recevoir l'un des types de déchets. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65F 3/14; B65F 3/00; B65F 3/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/00 (2006.01); B65F 3/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65F 3/001 (2013.01); B65F 3/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097884 A1 20010509; FR 2800719 A1 20010511; FR 2800719 B1 20020111

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030205

2002-07-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DUMP TRUCK FOR COLLECTING AND SELECTIVE DISCHARGING OF AT LEAST TWO KINDS OF WASTE

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020215

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI