Global Patent Index - EP 1097888 A2

EP 1097888 A2 2001-05-09 - Apparatus for folding printed sheet material

Title (en)

Apparatus for folding printed sheet material

Title (de)

Einrichtung zum Falten von bedrucktem Blattmaterial

Title (fr)

Appareil pour plier un matériau en feuille imprimè

Publication

EP 1097888 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00811005 A

Priority

CH 200099 A

Abstract (en)

The folding system for large format (A0 - A2) printed sheets (12) comprises a plotter (11) and a folding machine (20) which are connected by a conveyor (15). It has an independent printer (22) with its own conveyor (24') which can feed printed A3 or A4 sheets into the folding machine or directly to a collection shelf.

Abstract (de)

Eine Einrichtung (10) hat einen Plotter (11) oder dergleichen für das Bedrucken und eine nachfolgende Faltmaschine (20) für das Falten des vorzugsweise grossformatigen Blattmaterials (12), wobei zwischen dem Plotter (11) und der Faltmaschine (20) ein Förderteil (15) angeordnet ist, durch welchen das vom Plotter ausgegebene Blattmaterial in die Faltmaschine geleitet wird. Nebst dem Plotter (11) sind wenigstens ein zu diesem unabhängiger Drucker (22, 24) und entsprechende Fördermittel (22', 24', 33) vorhanden, durch welche ein bedrucktes Blattmaterial (16, 17) vorzugsweise mit kleinerem Format, wie A3 oder A4, von diesem Drucker (22, 24) in die Faltmaschine (20) zum Falten oder direkt zu einem Ausgabefach zuleitbar ist. Mit dieser Einrichtung (10) lassen sich Formate von A0 bis A5 in beliebiger Auswahl ausdrucken. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/54 (2006.01); B41J 11/00 (2006.01); B65H 45/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 45/12 (2013.01); B41J 3/546 (2013.01); B41J 11/007 (2013.01); B65H 2301/13 (2013.01); B65H 2301/141 (2013.01); B65H 2701/11312 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097888 A2 20010509; EP 1097888 A3 20020925

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030326

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-09-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65H 5/26 A, 7B 65H 45/12 B

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI