Global Patent Index - EP 1097891 A1

EP 1097891 A1 2001-05-09 - Device for cooling a traveling flexible web

Title (en)

Device for cooling a traveling flexible web

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Kühlen einer durchlaufenden flexiblen Bahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif de refroidissement d'une bande flexible en déplacement

Publication

EP 1097891 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119729 A

Priority

DE 19952917 A

Abstract (en)

The arrangement has driven rollers internally subjected to a coolant and substantially covered by the strip material and a device for regulating the strip's path, whereby the first roller can be adjusted in inclination. The first roller and its drive shaft are mounted separately and connected by a flexurally weak, torsionally strong compensation coupling. Forces perpendicular to the strip leaving the first roller are measured or evaluated. The arrangement is positioned after a dryer and has several driven rollers internally subjected to a coolant and substantially covered by the strip material passing round them and a device for regulating the strip's path, whereby the first roller can be adjusted in inclination. A measurement device on the first roller measures the tension in the strip material between the dryer and cooling device. The first roller (6.1) and its drive shaft (23) are mounted separately and connected by a flexurally weak, torsionally strong compensation coupling (22) and only forces perpendicular to the strip leaving the first roller are measured or evaluated.

Abstract (de)

Bei Drucklinien muß nach dem Druck die Papierbahn getrocknet und anschließend gekühlt werden. Bei Horizontaltrocknern wird die Bahn schwebend geführt. Hierbei ist es erforderlich, die Bahnspannung zu erfassen und so zu regeln, daß die Bahn weder flattert noch reißt. Aufgabe der Erfindung ist es, eine Kühlvorrichtung für durchlaufende flexible Bahnen zu schaffen, die eine exakte Bestimmung der Bahnspannung ermöglicht. Die erste Walze (6.1) einer Kühlvorrichtung (3) ist so gelagert, daß die Walze (6.1) um die Achse eines Bolzens (27) schwenkbar ist und so Bahnlauffehler korrigierbar sind. Die Lagergehäuse (11, 21) der Walze (6.1) sind auf Meßwertaufnehmern abgestützt. Die Walze (6.1) und ihr Antrieb (23, 24) sind getrennt gelagert, und so mit einer Ausgleichskupplung (22) verbunden, daß nur Torsionskräfte übertragen werden. Weiterhin sind die Meßvorrichtung (14) und die Vorrichtungen zur Bahnlaufkorrektur (19, 27) so angeordnet, daß Kräfte aus ablaufender Bahn (5) und Bahnlaufregelung für die Messung unwirksam sind. Meßfehler sind so vermieden. Papierbehandlung, Textilveredelung <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 23/188; B41F 23/04; B65H 23/038

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/04 (2006.01); B65H 23/038 (2006.01); B65H 23/188 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 23/0479 (2013.01); B65H 23/038 (2013.01); B65H 23/1888 (2013.01); B65H 2301/443243 (2013.01); B65H 2402/631 (2013.01); B65H 2515/31 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

B65H 2515/31 + B65H 2220/03

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097891 A1 20010509; DE 19952917 C1 20010613

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020117

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT NL SE

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI