Global Patent Index - EP 1097893 A3

EP 1097893 A3 2002-09-25 - Method and apparatus for severing a web for packaging or production machines for products in the tobacco industry

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for severing a web for packaging or production machines for products in the tobacco industry

Title (de)

Verfahren und Trenneinrichtung zum Trennen von Materialbahnen für Verpackungs- oder Herstellmaschinen von Produkten der tabakverarbeitenden Industrie

Title (fr)

Méthode et appareil pour couper une bande pour machines d'emballage ou de production des produits dans l'industrie du tabac

Publication

EP 1097893 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00122752 A

Priority

DE 19952986 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1097893A2] The method for cutting a strip (10) of material for cigarette making or packing machines into two comprises feeding it between cutters (20, 21) which separate it into two parts, so that the strip moves sideways. The cutters are controlled to follow this movement using a detector (30) which receives a signal indicating the position of the strip. An Independent claim is included for a device for carrying out the above method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 35/02; B65H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 41/00 (2006.01); A24C 5/18 (2006.01); A24C 5/20 (2006.01); B26D 7/00 (2006.01); B65B 19/02 (2006.01); B65B 61/08 (2006.01); B65H 23/02 (2006.01); B65H 35/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26D 7/0006 (2013.01); A24C 5/20 (2013.01); B65B 61/08 (2013.01); B65H 23/0204 (2013.01); B65H 35/02 (2013.01); B65H 2301/51536 (2013.01); B65H 2553/40 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097893 A2 20010509; EP 1097893 A3 20020925; CN 1301661 A 20010704; DE 19952986 A1 20010510; JP 2001158563 A 20010612; PL 343620 A1 20010507

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030906

2003-07-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI