Global Patent Index - EP 1097986 A1

EP 1097986 A1 2001-05-09 - Surface cleaning method

Title (en)

Surface cleaning method

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Reinigung von Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Procédé de nettoyage des surfaces

Publication

EP 1097986 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00123777 A

Priority

DE 19953457 A

Abstract (en)

Method of cleaning optionally coated glass, metal or plastics surfaces, uses a detergent composition and a mechanical cleaner with leather or textile fabric, bristles, sponge and/or fibers, which contacts the surface, at least at times. Before or during the cleaning procedure, part of the cleaner is brought into contact with antisoiling polymer(s), comprising amphiphilic polyester compounds.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein Verfahren zur Reinigung von Oberflächen unter Einsatz mechanischer, die Oberfläche zumindest zeitweilig berührender Reinigungsvorrichtungen und einer wäßrigen Reinigungsmittelzusammensetzung enthaltend Antisoiling-Polymere. Die Erfindung betrifft im wesentlichen ein Verfahren zur Reinigung von Glas-, und insbesondere lackierten, gewachsten oder sonstwie beschichteten Metall- oder Kunststoffoberflächen, bevorzugt ein Verfahren zur Reinigung von Fahrzeugen in Waschanlagen.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/00 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0036 (2013.01); C11D 3/3715 (2013.01); C11D 11/0023 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1097986 A1 20010509; DE 19953457 A1 20010523

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-21 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060511

2005-08-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASOL GERMANY GMBH

2004-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040727

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SASOL GERMANY GMBH

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI