Global Patent Index - EP 1098017 A2

EP 1098017 A2 2001-05-09 - Transporting device for conveying spinning cans

Title (en)

Transporting device for conveying spinning cans

Title (de)

Spinnkannentransporter

Title (fr)

Transporteur pour le transfert de pots de filature

Publication

EP 1098017 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00113652 A

Priority

DE 19953202 A

Abstract (en)

The trolley (11) for the transport of sliver cans has at least one can loading space (23,24) on both sides of the driver position (22) along the line (21) of the trolley, or in front of and behind the driver.. The driver position (22) is between the can reception (23) and can delivery (24) points. The driver position (22) can be changed in the trolley line (21), on loading and unloading, together with the driving controls (26). At least only one can loading point (23) is on one side of the driver position (22) and only at least one can unloading point (24) is on the other side of the driver. The driver position (22) incorporates two combined rectangular can support places (13). An empty can place (13) is at the actual driver position (22) at the start of a can exchange at the sliver processing machine. The trolley driving control (26) slides along the trolley line (21), at a level over the driver (25) head along a guide (27), with grips at hand height. The driver position and the trolley control can be installed in a fixed position between part-surfaces of the loading surface, which have loading surfaces of the same dimensions at the front and rear. The trolley capacity is set for a manual can exchange by the gap between the driver position and the can loading spaces which gives the max. can load on each part-surface. Each part-surface, to take rectangular sliver cans, has space to take max. three or four cans, flat against each other. When working with circular sliver cans, each part-surface has a turntable with at least two can spaces and pref. three or four. The turntable is operated manually. The turntable can also be structured to hold rectangular sliver cans. One part-surface can have a turntable, and the other part-surface has no turntable. The part-surfaces to hold the sliver cans can be fitted with sliding surfaces, roller paths or conveyor belts or chains, to assist the can movements. Each can support surface can have an edge roller, for easier can movement. The loading surface (12) is also the position for the standing driver (25).

Abstract (de)

Es wird ein Spinnkannentransporter mit Ladefläche für mehrere Spinnkannen und mit einem Einrichtungen zum Steuern des Transporters aufweisenden Fahrerstandplatz beschrieben. Um zu erreichen, daß die Bedienungsperson den Kannenwechsel bei griffbereiter Steuereinrichtung vom Fahrerstandplatz aus ausführen kann, wird auf der Ladefläche mindestens je ein Kannenstellplatz vor und hinter dem Fahrerstandplatz vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 9/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/38 (2006.01); D01H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 9/185 (2013.01); B65H 49/38 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098017 A2 20010509; EP 1098017 A3 20010704; DE 19953202 A1 20010510; JP 2001159036 A 20010612; US 6279306 B1 20010828

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030708

2002-05-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH FR IT LI

2002-02-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH FR IT LI

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI