Global Patent Index - EP 1098027 A2

EP 1098027 A2 2001-05-09 - Two stage hinge device for the door of electric household appliances, particularly for washing machine

Title (en)

Two stage hinge device for the door of electric household appliances, particularly for washing machine

Title (de)

Türscharnier für ein elektrisches Haushaltsgerät, insbesondere für eine Waschmaschine

Title (fr)

Charnière pour le porte d'un appareil électrique domestique, en particulier d'une machine à laver

Publication

EP 1098027 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00124080 A

Priority

IT BO990600 A

Abstract (en)

A hinge device (1), particularly for the door (3) of an electric household appliance (2), of the type washing machine, oven and the like, includes a connection element (10) connected to the frame (6) of the appliance (2), a support element (30) to which is connected the door (3) and a shaped element (20), whose first end (21) is hinged to the connection element (10), and whose second end (23) is hinged to the support element (30). The device further includes stop means, first (14) and second (34) fit to limit the amplitude of the rotations, respectively first (R1), between the shaped element (20) and the connection element (10), and second (R2), between the support element (30) and the shaped element (20), and friction means (32), positioned between the shaped element (20) and the support element (30). The friction means (32) are fit to differentiate the values of the counter actions exerting against the rotations, first (R1) and second (R2), determining a two-stage opening-closing for the door (3), so that this latter changes from a closing condition (C), in which the door (3) closes the load opening (5) of the appliance (2), to an extreme opening condition (A), in which the same door (3) is at the maximum distance from the opening (5), through an intermediate opening condition (B) in correspondence of which there is the passage between the conditions of rotations, first (R1) and second (R2). <IMAGE> <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 39/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 11/105 (2013.01); D06F 39/14 (2013.01); E05D 3/12 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/312 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098027 A2 20010509; EP 1098027 A3 20010919; IT 1311136 B1 20020304; IT BO990600 A1 20010508; IT BO990600 D0 19991108

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030930

2003-09-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TWO STAGE HINGE DEVICE FOR THE DOOR OF ELECTRIC HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES, PARTICULARLY FOR WASHING MACHINE

2003-07-09 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TWO STAGE HINGE DEVICE FOR THE DOOR OF ELECTRIC HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCES, PARTICULARLY FOR WASHING MACHINE

2002-07-03 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2002-06-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-09-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-09-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI