Global Patent Index - EP 1098033 A2

EP 1098033 A2 2001-05-09 - Extended nip press roll

Title (en)

Extended nip press roll

Title (de)

Schuhpresswalze

Title (fr)

Rouleau de pressage à pincage prolongé

Publication

EP 1098033 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120830 A

Priority

DE 19953474 A

Abstract (en)

The shoe press roller to extract water from a wet fiber web, in the prodn. of paper or cardboard or tissue, has a transfer zone (9) at the press gap (3) with its concave curvature. The transfer zone starts with a zone (10) with a relatively large convex curve radius, and has an end zone (11) with a convex curvature of a relatively small curve radius. The roller mantle (2) runs over at least one guide (12) at the transfer zone (9), combined with the press unit (4) and pref. in a one-piece structure. The transfer zone (9) has at least one intermediate zone (13) with a convex curvature, between the start (10) and end (11) zones. The curve radius of the intermediate zone (13) is larger than the curve radius of the start (10) and end (11) zones. The intermediate zone (13) can be flat. The start zone (10) is relatively short, and pref. significantly shorter than the length of the intermediate zone (13). The surface of the roller mantle (2) has grooves and/or blind drillings. The water trap is a gutter (8), with suction. An additional belt, as a water extraction or transfer belt (14), is between the web (1) and the counter roller (6). The continuous belts (7,14) are blankets or fourdriniers, with the web between them.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Schuhpresswalze zur Entwässerung einer Faserstoffbahn (1), insbesondere einer Papier-, Karton-oder Tissuebahn in Maschinen zur Herstellung und/oder Veredelung derselben bestehend aus einem flexiblen Walzenmantel (2) mit profilierter Oberfläche zur Wasseraufnahme, die zur Bildung eines Pressspaltes (3) von zumindest einem Anpresselement (4) mit konkaver Anpressfläche (5) gegen eine zylindrische Gegenwalze (6) gedrückt wird, wobei zumindest zwischen der Schuhpresswalze und der Faserstoffbahn (1) ein endloses Entwässerungsband (7) zur Aufnahme des ausgepressten Wassers verläuft, welches nach dem Pressspalt (3) vom Walzenmantel (2) der Schuhpresswalze weggeführt wird und wobei möglichst nach am Pressspalt (3) zwischen der Schuhpresswalze und diesem Entwässerungsband (7) eine Wasserauffangvorrichtung (8) zur Aufnahme und Abführung des von dem Walzenmantel (2) der Schuhpresswalze abgeschleuderten Wassers angeordnet ist. Dabei soll einer Rückbefeuchtung des Entwässerungsbandes (7) infolge des Abschleuderns des Oberflächenwassers des Walzenmantels (2) dadurch entgegen gewirkt werden, dass sich an den konkav gekrümmten Pressspalt (3) ein Übergangsbereich (9) anschließt, der mit einer konvex gekrümmten Anfangszone (10) mit relativ großem Krümmungsradius beginnt und mit einer konvex gekrümmten Endzone (11) mit relativ kleinem Krümmungsradius endet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 3/0218 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098033 A2 20010509; EP 1098033 A3 20011107; DE 19953474 A1 20010510; US 6383338 B1 20020507

INPADOC legal status


2006-09-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060331

2006-09-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PATENT GMBH

2002-07-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE FI SE

2002-07-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020507

2001-11-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FI SE

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI