Global Patent Index - EP 1098035 A2

EP 1098035 A2 2001-05-09 - Twin-wire former

Title (en)

Twin-wire former

Title (de)

Doppelsiebformer

Title (fr)

Section de formage à deux toiles

Publication

EP 1098035 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00116920 A

Priority

DE 19952936 A

Abstract (en)

The double-fourdrinier section (10) of a papermaking/cardboard prodn. machine, where the pulp is converted into a wet fiber web by water extraction, has a bar (26) within the fourdrinier loop at the pulp entry end. The bar (26) has a leading projection (28) with an outer surface (28') in a convex curvature, and a curved running surface (30) in a convex curve in the direction (L) of fourdrinier travel. The min. curve radius of the running surface (30) is larger than the radius of the projection (28) curvature. The outer fourdrinier (16) is deflected by the bar (28) by an angle of 1-30 degrees and pref. 10-20 degrees . The bar (28) has a guide surface for the outer fourdrinier (16) at the transit between the projection (28) and the running surface (30). The guide surface has a convex curvature at the junction with the running surface (30), with a min. curve radius which is larger than the radius of the running surface (30) curvature. The guide surface section and the running surface (30) are flush with each other at a curved or flat transit. The guide surface has a continuous increasing curve radius in the direction (L) of fourdrinier movement, towards the running surface. The bar projection (28) has a curve radius of 0.5-1.0 mm. The curve radius of the running surface (30) is 20-100 mm and pref. 30-50 mm. The curve radius of the guide surface section is 100-1000 mm. The running surface (30) has a length of 10-20 mm. The support for the outer fourdrinier (16) is a suction box (24), with an adjustable fluid pressure acting with the bar (28) to set the level of penetration of the suction box (24) into the upper fourdrinier (16). The suction box fluid pressure setting is controlled and/or regulated.. The running surface (30) has a continuous increasing curve radius, in the direction (L) of fourdrinier travel, rising from 30 mm to 100 mm. The bar has a flush transit between the projection (28) and the running surface (30). The bar (26) has a mounting with elastic damping at the body or frame of the suction box (24). The bar projection can have an extension, of a pliable and elastic material, held at the outer fourdrinier (16) by the flow forces.

Abstract (de)

Ein Doppelsiebformer 10 zum Bilden einer Faserstoffbahn wie insbesondere einer Papier- oder Kartonbahn umfaßt zwei umlaufende endlose Siebe 14, 16, die unter Bildung eines Stoffeinlaufspaltes 18 zusammenlaufen und eine Doppelsiebzone 20 bilden, in der die beiden Siebe 14, 16 gemeinsam insbesondere über eine mit dem inneren 14 der beiden Siebe 14, 16 in Kontakt kommende Formierwalze 22 sowie eine mit dem Außensieb 16 in Kontakt kommende Stützeinrichtung 24 geführt sind, die innerhalb der Schlaufe des Außensiebes 16 angeordnet und mit einer in Sieblaufrichtung L betrachtet vorderen Einlaufleiste 26 versehen ist, die eine vordere Nase 28 mit einer allgemein konvex gekrümmten Außenfläche 28' sowie eine sich in Sieblaufrichtung L daran anschließende Auflauffläche 30 für das Außensieb 16 umfaßt. Die sich an die Nase 28 anschließende Auflauffläche 30 der Einlaufleiste 26 ist allgemein konvex gekrümmt, wobei der minimale Krümmungsradius dieser Auflauffläche 30 größer ist als der der Nase 28. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21F 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/48 (2006.01); D21F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 9/003 (2013.01); D21F 1/48 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098035 A2 20010509; EP 1098035 A3 20010704; EP 1098035 B1 20040721; DE 19952936 A1 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2013-09-26 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50007117

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130301

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120805

2013-04-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120805

2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120806

2013-04-02 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20110824

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20110812

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110823

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-07-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050422

2004-08-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007117 P 20040826

2004-08-24 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2002-03-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI IT SE

2002-03-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020104

2001-07-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI IT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI