Global Patent Index - EP 1098040 A2

EP 1098040 A2 2001-05-09 - Drainage apparatus

Title (en)

Drainage apparatus

Title (de)

Ablaufvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'écoulement

Publication

EP 1098040 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00304534 A

Priority

GB 9912158 A

Abstract (en)

A drainage apparatus, for use for instance in a shower for wheelchair users, comprises a base member in the form of a catchment tray 12, a grate 14 and a gutter cap 16. Catchment tray 12 has a drainage area 18 within which are ribs forming grate supports. Between grate supports 20 are drainage pathways 22 which lead liquid under gravity towards drainage outlet 24. Drainage grate 14 comprises elongate slats 30 which are connected by flexible joints 32. In use grate 14 is placed over catchment tray 12 so that elongate slats 30 lie generally perpendicular to grate supports means 20. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/20; E03F 5/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/40 (2006.01); E03C 1/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/405 (2013.01); A47K 3/40 (2013.01); E03C 1/20 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098040 A2 20010509; EP 1098040 A3 20020116; GB 9912158 D0 19990728

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051229

2005-09-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: CROSBY, ANDREW MARK

2002-10-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020712

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-01-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 03C 1/20 A, 7A 47K 3/40 B

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI