Global Patent Index - EP 1098041 A1

EP 1098041 A1 2001-05-09 - Shower tray comprising a base which can be emptied by its lowest point

Title (en)

Shower tray comprising a base which can be emptied by its lowest point

Title (de)

Duschtasse mit durch ihren Boden leerbaren Wanne

Title (fr)

Receveur de douche du type comprenant un bac vidangeable par son fond

Publication

EP 1098041 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00440292 A

Priority

FR 9913708 A

Abstract (en)

The shower tray (1) has a base with an outlet for the water, linked to a drain pipe (6) and fitted with a siphon (3, 4) which has a trap and a hydraulic system (2) to accelerate the water flow. The hydraulic system consists of consists of a siphon inlet surface in a ratio of above 1 : 1 with the inlet surface of the drain pipe, the siphon being made from two components (3, 4) of complementary shape, fitted detachably one above the other and forming a chicane which acts as a water trap to prevent foul odours rising.

Abstract (fr)

Receveur de douche du type comprenant un bac vidangeable (1) par son fond et des moyens permettant d'acheminer l'eau tombant sur ledit fond jusque dans un siphon (3,4) destiné à être connecté en sortie à une conduite d'évacuation normalisée et comprenant des moyens de retenue d'eau pour former une garde d'eau contre la remontée des mauvaises odeurs. Le siphon (3,4) est intégré partiellement ou totalement dans le bac (1) et il comporte des moyens hydrauliques (17,2) permettant d'augmenter la vitesse d'évacuation de l'eau. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E03C 1/22; A47K 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/40 (2006.01); E03C 1/22 (2006.01); E03C 1/29 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/405 (2013.01); A47K 3/40 (2013.01); E03C 1/22 (2013.01); E03C 1/29 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098041 A1 20010509; FR 2800260 A1 20010504; FR 2800260 B1 20020412

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-08 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060922

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020311

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI