Global Patent Index - EP 1098043 A1

EP 1098043 A1 2001-05-09 - Building element for the sound dampened connection of building parts

Title (en)

Building element for the sound dampened connection of building parts

Title (de)

Bauelement zur schallgedämmten Verbindung von Bauteilen

Title (fr)

Elément de construction pour la connection insonorisée de parties de constructions

Publication

EP 1098043 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99122130 A

Priority

EP 99122130 A

Abstract (en)

the structural element has a force-transferring connecting element (4) which is concreted into one of the parts (2) where it is held by a cross-sectional expansion (11). A sound-absorbing cover (5) encloses the connecting element in the concreted-in area. The connecting element is preferably in two parts comprising an anchor element concreted into the one part and a connector (7) for the other part. The anchor and connector fit together with a push-fit or screw connection.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Bauelement (1) zur schallgedämmten Verbindung zweier Bauteile (2, 3) und besteht aus einem kraftübertragenden Verbindungselement (4), das zumindest in eines der beiden Bauteile einbetoniert und in dem einen Bauteil über eine Querschnittserweiterung (11) formschlüssig gehalten ist, sowie aus einer schalldämmenden Umhüllung (5), die das Verbindungselement im einbetonierten Bereich des einen Bauteils umgibt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/41; E04B 1/82

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01); E04B 1/82 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/4164 (2013.01); E04B 1/4107 (2013.01); E04B 1/4121 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8254 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098043 A1 20010509

INPADOC legal status


2006-01-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050720

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031216

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-10-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010808

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI NL

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI