Global Patent Index - EP 1098047 A1

EP 1098047 A1 2001-05-09 - A clip

Title (en)

A clip

Title (de)

Klammer

Title (fr)

Une attache

Publication

EP 1098047 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00850182 A

Priority

SE 9904013 A

Abstract (en)

A clip having a pre-mounted fastener screw for mounting covering sheets, such as roofing sheets, onto an underlying surface, said clip including a base plate (1) that has an opening in which a screw (5) is pre-mounted and extends generally normal to the plane of the base plate (1), with the pointed tip (53) of the screw passing through the opening. The base plate (1) carries an attachment tongue (13) which is intended to be fastened to a covering sheet that is to be anchored to the underlying surface via the base plate (1) and the screw (5). The clip includes two elongate and mutually opposing tongues whose longitudinal extensions lie in an axial plane to said opening perpendicular to the base plate. The tongues are bent up at an acute angle from the base plate and the three short-edges (41), which are concave, of said tongues engage the stem (41) of the screw (5) at generally similar heights above the base plate (1). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04D 3/362

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/362 (2006.01); E04D 3/361 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04D 3/362 (2013.01); E04D 2003/3615 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098047 A1 20010509; EP 1098047 B1 20040714; DE 60012109 D1 20040819; DE 60012109 T2 20041118; SE 515979 C2 20011105; SE 9904013 D0 19991104; SE 9904013 L 20010505

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171101

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171026

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171025

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-10-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-11-28 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: BJARNES SYSTEM AB, SE

- Effective date: 20141027

2014-11-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BJARNES SYSTEM AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SVANBERG, BJARNE, SOEDERTAELJE, SE

- Document: DE 60012109

- Effective date: 20141014

2014-11-20 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BJARNES SYSTEM AB, SE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BJARNES SYSTEM AG, SOEDERTAELJE, SE

- Document: DE 60012109

- Effective date: 20141029

2014-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012109

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20141029

2014-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012109

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

- Effective date: 20141014

2014-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012109

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20141029

2014-11-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012109

- Representative's name: MEISSNER BOLTE PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELTE P, DE

- Effective date: 20141014

2014-11-12 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20141016 AND 20141022

2014-10-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 60012109

- Representative's name: MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER GBR, DE

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012109 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-07-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011006

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI