Global Patent Index - EP 1098051 A1

EP 1098051 A1 2001-05-09 - Fence post and fence obtained by assembling wired panels on the posts

Title (en)

Fence post and fence obtained by assembling wired panels on the posts

Title (de)

Zaunpfosten und Zaun erstellt durch zusammenfügen von Zaunmatten an den Pfosten

Title (fr)

Poteaux de clôture et clôture obtenue par l'assemblage de panneaux en treillis sur de tels poteaux

Publication

EP 1098051 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00490047 A

Priority

FR 9914244 A

Abstract (en)

The hollow fence post comprises a front part (A) and a fastening part (B) for the fence panel and rear part (C). The fastening part has two grooves (1a,1b) with openings on opposite sides. The grooves have a groove (7a,7b) laterally edged by a corner iron (4a,4b) formed by folding the sheet metal defining the groove bottom walls on itself.

Abstract (fr)

Poteau de clôture profilé creux comprenant, lorsque vu en coupe transversale perpendiculaire à sa direction d'élancement, une première partie (A) dite avant, une deuxième partie (B) dite d'accrochage du panneau et une troisième partie (C) dite arrière, caractérisé en ce que la deuxième partie (B) comporte deux gorges (1a, 1b) à ouverture latérale opposées, ces gorges (1a, 1b) étant pourvues d'une rainure (7a, 7b) bordée latéralement par une cornière (4a, 4b) formée par le repli sur elle-même de la tôle définissant la paroi de fond des gorges. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04H 17/20; E04H 17/12; E04H 17/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/12 (2006.01); E04H 17/16 (2006.01); E04H 17/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04H 17/20 (2013.01); E04H 17/12 (2013.01); E04H 17/161 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098051 A1 20010509; EP 1098051 B1 20080820; AT 405716 T 20080915; DE 60000224 D1 20020725; DK 1098051 T3 20090105; ES 2312329 T3 20090301; FR 2800779 A1 20010511; FR 2800779 B1 20081107

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20161021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161027

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161026

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161109

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20161021

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-12-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-09 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080820

2011-07-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2011-03-31 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BOUTTEAU, CORINNE

- Free text: BOUTTEAU, CORINNE#6, RUE DES BERCEAUX#59145 BERLAIMONT (FR) -TRANSFER TO- BOUTTEAU, CORINNE#6, RUE DES BERCEAUX#59145 BERLAIMONT (FR)

2010-08-31 [PG25 TR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080820

2010-07-30 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080820

2010-02-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20080820

2010-01-22 [REG FR D3] DECISION TO REVOKE THE DECISION OF LAPSE

2009-07-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-06-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-04-15 [REG AT UEP] PUBLICATION OF TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION

- Document: AT 405716 T

2009-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2312329 T3

2009-01-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2008-12-09 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2008-09-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2008-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2008-08-31 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: LA DELIVRANCE DU 19.06.2002 A ETE REVOCEE PAR L'OEB

2008-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2008-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2008-07-09 [19F] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20080605

2006-02-01 [19F] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20060403

2005-05-04 [19F] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER STAY OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20050331

2003-05-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-02-19 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 1098051E

2003-01-06 [NLXE] NL: OTHER COMMUNICATIONS CONCERNING EP-PATENTS (PART 3 HEADING XE)

- Free text: PAT. BUL. 08/2002 HEADING PE, SECTION 2 AND 3 PAT. BUL. 11/2002. PATENTNUMBER 1098051 SHOULD BE DELETED (SEE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN 20020911/37).

2002-10-15 [REG AT EBA] NOTIFICATION SUSPENDED (E-SERIES)

- Document: AT 405716 T

2002-09-11 [29A] SUSPENSION OF PROCEEDINGS (CORRECTION) AFTER GRANT

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-09-11 [DB1] DELETION OF B1 DOCUMENT

2002-09-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-08-30 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: LA DELIVRANCE DU BREVET A ETE REVOQUEE PAR L'OEB.A

2002-07-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60000224 20020725

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2002-07-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219546 T 20020715

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020221

2002-03-13 [111L] LICENCES

- Free text: 20011119 0100 PLACE S.A.

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-06-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI