Global Patent Index - EP 1098053 A2

EP 1098053 A2 2001-05-09 - Split mandrel

Title (en)

Split mandrel

Title (de)

Geteilter Dorn

Title (fr)

Mandrin fendu

Publication

EP 1098053 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890327 A

Priority

AT 184999 A

Abstract (en)

Between the parts (5,6) of the divided pin is a positive connection which engages and disengages electro-mechanically by means of a coupling (8). One of the pin-parts contains an electro-mechanical drive mechanism especially a motor. A shaft protrudes as an axial extension of one of the pin parts and on which the other pin part is rotarily mounted. A coupling pin (16) can be engaged into, and disengaged from, the other pin part.

Abstract (de)

Die kinematische Verbindung von Drückern mit einem Schloss (1) zum Zwecke der Fallenbetätigung umfasst einen geteilten Dorn 4 und eine elektromechanische ein- und ausrückbare Kupplung (7, 8) zwischen den Dornteilen (5, 6). Ein Dornteil (6) ist für die Aufnahme in einer formschlüssigen Ausnehmung einer Drückernuss (2) vorgesehen, während der andere Dornteil (5) gegenüber dem erstgenannten Dornteil (6) und damit gegenüber der Drückernuss (2) im Wesentlichen frei drehbar gelagert ist. Erst bei Einrücken der Kupplung (7, 8) ist eine Fallenbetätigung auch über den anderen Dornteil (5) möglich. Bei einer bevorzugten Ausführungsform mit radialer Kupplung liegen diesseits und jenseits der Teilungsebene des Dornes (4) jeweils mitdrehende Platten (25, 26). Eine davon trägt eine Klinke (28), die im entkuppelten Zustand durch Federvorspannung außerhalb eines Drehkreises einer Flanke (27) der anderen Platte (25) liegt und die zum Kuppeln durch eine Steuerkulisse (30) eines Steuermoduls in das Innere des Drehkreises geschwenkt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 15/04 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/0688 (2013.01); E05B 47/0692 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 2015/0486 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0015 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0023 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0025 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0026 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098053 A2 20010509; EP 1098053 A3 20010516; AT 408119 B 20010925; AT A184999 A 20010115

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011117

2002-03-21 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 05B 47/00 A, 7E 05B 47/06 B

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI