Global Patent Index - EP 1098055 A2

EP 1098055 A2 2001-05-09 - Key for a lock

Title (en)

Key for a lock

Title (de)

Schlüssel für ein Schloss

Title (fr)

Clé pour une serrure

Publication

EP 1098055 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123677 A

Priority

ES 9902401 A

Abstract (en)

The key has a key head (1) with an interactively programmable chip (3) and an electrically conducting loop (4) and a key shaft (2) for insertion into a lock cylinder shaft (14). The chip has an electronic identification code and the shaft has a pair of protruding electrical contacts (6) connected to the interactively programmable chip in the key head. The code can be fixed or randomly altered per opening.

Abstract (de)

Schlüssel für ein Schloß mit: einem Schlüsselkopf (1), in dem ein interaktiver programmierbarer Chip (3) und eine elektrische Leiterschleife (4) mit elektronischer Identifikationskodierung angeordnet sind, die entweder fest oder entsprechend einer Folge mittels eines Datenverarbeitungsprogramms modifizierbar ist, einem Schlüsselschaft (2), der in den Schlüsselkanal (14) eines entsprechenden Schließzylinders (11) einsetzbar und mit dem Schlüsselkopf (1) über einen äußeren Halsabschnitt (5) zu einem Schließzylinder (11) verbunden ist, wobei der Schlüsselschaft (2) einen Querschnitt mit beliebiger, an sich bekannter Form aufweist, und wobei in dem hinteren Teil des Schlüsselschafts vor dem äußeren Halsabschnitt (5) ein Paar von gegenüberliegenden elektrischen Kontaktknöpfen (6) vorspringt, die mit dem interaktiven programmierbaren Chip (3) des Schlüsselkopfes (1) verbunden sind, und wobei der Schaft zumindest eine Vertiefung (7) aufweist, die reziprok zu der Spitze eines radialen Zuhaltungsstiftes (15) des Rotors (12) des Schließzylinders (11) eingearbeitet ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07C 9/00; E05B 19/00; E05B 35/00; E05B 49/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 35/00 (2006.01); G07C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 35/003 (2013.01); G07C 9/00182 (2013.01); G07C 9/00857 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00238 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00761 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00777 (2013.01); G07C 2009/00992 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098055 A2 20010509; EP 1098055 A3 20040121; ES 2178526 A1 20021216; ES 2178526 B1 20040816

INPADOC legal status


2006-10-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060407

2004-10-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-09-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040721

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 07C 9/00 A

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 35/00 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 19/00 B

2004-01-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7E 05B 49/00 B

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI