Global Patent Index - EP 1098056 A1

EP 1098056 A1 2001-05-09 - Multiple bolt lock

Title (en)

Multiple bolt lock

Title (de)

Mehrriegelverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure à plusieurs pênes

Publication

EP 1098056 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890298 A

Priority

AT 185099 A

Abstract (en)

The lock has a main lock housing with a locking bar, catch and trigger button has at least one opening for a lock cylinder. The lock switch and opening are mounted in the main lock housing and the cylinder-actuated gearbox is preferably in an auxiliary housing. The electric motor engages the gearbox or dual lock cylinder, especially a knob, a key or a cylinder core. The lock has electric motor actuation and control via a lock switch and additional actuation via a gearbox engaged with a lock cylinder gear rim and the teeth on a thrust rod. A main lock housing (14) with a locking bar, catch and trigger button has at least one opening for a lock cylinder (19). The lock switch and opening are mounted in the main lock housing and the cylinder-actuated gearbox (22) is preferably in an auxiliary housing (24). The electric motor (18) engages the gearbox or dual lock cylinder (20), especially a knob (21), a key or a cylinder core.

Abstract (de)

Ein Mehrriegelverschluss mit elektromotorischer Betätigung umfasst einen Schlüsselschalter mit Schließzylinder (19) für einen Elektromotor (18, 25) und einen weiteren Schließzylinder, insbesondere Doppelschließzylinder (20, 26) mit einseitigem Knauf (21, 27) zur Betätigung eines Getriebes (22). Mit Hilfe des Elektromotors (18, 25), der in das Getriebe (22) oder unmittelbar in eine Verzahnung (23) einer Schubstange (1) eingreift, wird der Mehrriegelverschluss im Normalfall betätigt. Der Doppelschließzylinder (20, 26), der mit dem Getriebe (22) zusammenwirkt, dient der Notöffnung, z.B. bei Stromausfall. Der Schlüsselschalter mit dem zugeordneten Schließzylinder (19) befindet sich zusammen mit Drückernuss (6), Falle (10) und Riegel (15) im Hauptschlossgehäuse (14). Doppelschließzylinder (20, 26) mit Getriebe (22) und Elektromotor (18, 25) bilden eine getrennte Baugruppe und sind vorzugsweise in einem Zusatzgehäuse (24) untergebracht. Im Hauptschlossgehäuse (14) sind ferner ein Wechsel, insbesondere ein Winkelhebel (11) für den Fallenrückzug durch einen Zapfen (12) an der Schubstange (1) und eine Kulisse mit Steuerschlitz (17) bzw. ein Getriebe für die Riegelbetätigung (15) vorgesehen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02; E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/023 (2013.01); E05B 47/0012 (2013.01); E05B 2047/002 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0026 (2013.01); E05B 2047/0084 (2013.01); E05C 9/1841 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098056 A1 20010509; AT 409020 B 20020527; AT A185099 A 20010915

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070503

2005-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050111

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI