Global Patent Index - EP 1098057 A1

EP 1098057 A1 2001-05-09 - Cylinder operated multiple bolt lock

Title (en)

Cylinder operated multiple bolt lock

Title (de)

Zylinderbetätigbarer Mehrriegelverschluss

Title (fr)

Serrure à plusieurs pênes opéré par serrure cylindrique

Publication

EP 1098057 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00890306 A

Priority

  • AT 186499 A
  • AT 14642000 A

Abstract (en)

A gear (6) operated by the closure cylinder is kinematically connected with the connecting rod (3) or an attached slide piece (2) to the connecting rod, so as to be self-locking. The connecting rod or slide piece can be disconnected from the gear. A nut (15) has at least one carrier or lever (16) for releasing the coupling (9) and for moving the released connecting rod or slide piece in the multiple bolt fastening's open position.

Abstract (de)

Ein zylinderbetätigbarer Mehrriegelverschluss mit Panikfunktion verfügt über einen Drücker an der Innenseite bzw. Raumseite und über einen Schließzylinder (4), der über ein Getriebe (6) eine Schubstange (3) bzw. einen Schubstangenanschluss-Schieber (2) in die Offenstellung oder Sperrstellung der Riegel verschiebt. Die Schubstange (3) bzw. der Schubstangenanschluss-Schieber (2) ist von dem Getriebe (6) abkuppelbar. Insbesondere ist ein Verzahnungsteil (8) mit einer linearen zahnstangenähnlichen Verzahnung, in die das Getriebe (6) bzw. ein Zahnrad mit Stockgetriebe (7) eingreift, als abkuppelbares Anschlussstück vorgesehen. Zum Abkuppeln weist eine Drückernuss (15) einen Nusshebel (16) auf, der beim Niederdrücken des Drückers eine Kupplung (9) zum Verzahnungsteil (8) löst und die nun freie Schubstange (3) bzw. den Schubstangenanschluss-Schieber (2) in Richtung eines Öffnens der Riegel des Mehrriegelverschlusses mitnimmt. Falle (14) und Schlossriegel (12) werden über Nusshebel (16) bzw. eine Umlenkung (13) zurückgezogen. Die Kupplung selbst kann als Federzunge (10) mit Kupplungszapfen (11) oder als Haken (20) ausgebildet sein, der über einen Auslösehebel (24) von dem Nusshebel (16) ausgelenkt wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 63/00 (2006.01); E05B 65/10 (2006.01); E05C 9/02 (2006.01); E05C 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/023 (2013.01); E05B 63/0069 (2013.01); E05B 65/1086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098057 A1 20010509; EP 1098057 B1 20041215; AT 408563 B 20020125; AT A14642000 A 20010515; DE 50008951 D1 20050120

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071011

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080630

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061011

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061011

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061031

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-09-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060922

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-12-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-12-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050916

2005-10-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051003

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008951 P 20050120

2005-01-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041215

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031009

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI