Global Patent Index - EP 1098061 A2

EP 1098061 A2 2001-05-09 - Door with casing frame

Title (en)

Door with casing frame

Title (de)

Tür mit Türrahmen

Title (fr)

Porte avec dormant

Publication

EP 1098061 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00120688 A

Priority

DE 29919395 U

Abstract (en)

The door (10) has at least on its side facing the frame a surface which undulates in the transverse direction. The upper frame cross piece (12) has a correspondingly undulated ledge for taking up the upper edge of the door panel. The door panel can be a flat plate with an undulating surface profile fitted on. A rubber seal (13) can be provided between the door panel and the upper cross piece of the door frame.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft eine Tür (10) mit Türrahmen (11), wobei die Tür (10) mindestens an ihrer dem Rahmen (11) zugewandten Seite eine in Querrichtung gewellte Oberfläche aufweist und das obere Rahmenquerstück (12) einen entsprechend gewellt geformten Absatz zur Aufnahme des oberen Randes des Türblattes aufweist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/70; E06B 1/52

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/06 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 1/06 (2013.01); E06B 3/70 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7053 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29919395 U1 20000105; EP 1098061 A2 20010509; EP 1098061 A3 20020213

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-12-05 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-02-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-02-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI