Global Patent Index - EP 1098063 A3

EP 1098063 A3 2003-06-18 - Tubular motor

Title (en)

Tubular motor

Title (de)

Rohrmotor

Title (fr)

Moteur tubulaire

Publication

EP 1098063 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00119973 A

Priority

DE 19953200 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1098063A2] The electric drive motor(3) is contained in a drive housing (2) with a drive shaft (8). A reducing gear is positioned in a gear housing (33) and possesses a driven shaft (30) and is coupled with the drive shaft by means of a gear input shaft . A wrap spring brake (29) secures the driven shaft when especially the drive is switched off. A ring element is positioned between the wrap spring and the gear housing and discharges the momentum from the driven shaft into the gear housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/72; F16D 49/02; F16D 67/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/72 (2006.01); F16D 51/02 (2006.01); F16D 67/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/72 (2013.01); F16D 51/02 (2013.01); F16D 67/00 (2013.01); E06B 2009/725 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098063 A2 20010509; EP 1098063 A3 20030618; EP 1098063 B1 20070214; DE 19953200 A1 20010510; DE 50014056 D1 20070329; ES 2299415 T3 20080601; US 6700246 B1 20040302

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121001

2013-06-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130531

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111010

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070915

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070915

2008-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2299415 T3

2008-05-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070914

2008-01-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071115

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070214

2007-09-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20070822

2007-08-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-08-22 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: NIDEC MOTORS & ACTUATORS (GERMANY) GMBH

2007-03-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014056 P 20070329

2007-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2007-02-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO MOTOREN UND AKTUATOREN GMBH

2004-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO AUTO-ELECTRIC WISCHER UND MOTOREN GMBH

2004-03-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-02-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VALEO WISCHERSYSTEME GMBH

2004-01-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031121

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI