Global Patent Index - EP 1098064 A1

EP 1098064 A1 2001-05-09 - Auger drilling device

Title (en)

Auger drilling device

Title (de)

Schneckenbohrvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de forage du type à tarière

Publication

EP 1098064 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00402880 A

Priority

FR 9913793 A

Abstract (en)

The top (30a) of a vertical cylindrical tube (30) Is fixed to a head assembly (18), the lower end (30b) being open. The tube length (l2) considerably exceeds that (l1) of the auger. The drilling tool shaft is translated w.r.t the head assembly. In a first retracted position, the auger is partly accommodated in the tube. In a second extended position, it is entirely below the end of the tube. The tube is held against rotation under the operational forces applied to it. Preferred Features: Rotation is limited by spline-like formations along the entire external face of the tube. These mesh with internal splines of a holder fixed to the vertical guidance system. A single drilling tool is included, its auger (24) having a diameter no less than the external diameter of the tube. Alternatively, a second auger is located below the first, with concentric drive shaft construction, having an additional head assembly, permitting displacement of the second auger relative to the first head assembly. The first auger is a variable core type. A tube for concrete injection is included. The internal face of the tube (30) carries projections over at least part of its length.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un dispositif de forage. Il comprend des moyens de guidage en translation verticale (12), au moins un premier outil de forage (20) comprenant une première tarière (24) fixée à l'extrémité inférieure d'une première tige (22), un chariot (16) assujetti à se déplacer verticalement le long des moyens de guidage, au moins une première tête de montage (18) solidaire dudit chariot et munie de moyens de mise en rotation de la tige dudit outil de forage, un tubage (30) ayant la forme d'un cylindre à génératrices verticales, dont l'extrémité supérieure (30a) est solidaire de ladite tête de montage (18) et dont l'extrémité inférieure (30b) est ouverte, des moyens (54) pour déplacer en translation ladite tige (22) par rapport à la tête de montage (18) et des moyens (40, 42) pour au moins limiter la rotation dudit tubage sous l'effet des contraintes qui lui sont appliquées. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 7/00; E21B 3/02; E21B 7/20; E21B 10/44; E21B 12/06; E21B 15/00; E21B 17/00; E21B 19/086; E21B 19/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E02D 5/38 (2006.01); E21B 7/00 (2006.01); E21B 7/20 (2006.01); E21B 10/44 (2006.01); E21B 12/06 (2006.01); E21B 15/00 (2006.01); E21B 17/00 (2006.01); E21B 19/086 (2006.01); E21B 19/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 7/002 (2013.01); E02D 5/385 (2013.01); E21B 7/201 (2013.01); E21B 10/44 (2013.01); E21B 12/06 (2013.01); E21B 15/00 (2013.01); E21B 17/00 (2013.01); E21B 19/086 (2013.01); E21B 19/24 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098064 A1 20010509; FR 2800796 A1 20010511; FR 2800796 B1 20020201

INPADOC legal status


2008-05-30 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036094

2003-11-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030502

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES GB IT

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010911

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI