Global Patent Index - EP 1098089 A2

EP 1098089 A2 2001-05-09 - Radial piston pump with cam stabilisation

Title (en)

Radial piston pump with cam stabilisation

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Stabilisierung des Exzenterrings einer Radialkolbenpumpe

Title (fr)

Pompe à pistons radiaux avec système de stabilisation de la came

Publication

EP 1098089 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00122152 A

Priority

DE 19949166 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19949166A1] The device is for an eccentric ring (2) of an eccentric (1), rotating with a shaft in the pump frame. Ring or frame has at least one additional circular guide for a shaft (48) of the other component, which is offset relative to the central axis (8) of the eccentric. The offset axis and central axis (47) of the circular guide extend parallel to the central eccentric axis and to the rotary axis (7) of the eccentric shaft. The intersection points of all four axis with a radial plane form a parallelogram.

Abstract (de)

Beschrieben wird eine Vorrichtung zur Stabilisierung des die Kolben einer Radialkolbenpumpe bewegenden Exzenterrings, derart daß die beiden durch den Exzenterring und das Pumpengeäuse gebildeten Körper eine kreisende Bewegung relativ zueinander ausführen, wenn die Exzenterwelle rotiert. Erfindungsgemäß ist an dem einen der beiden Körper zumindest eine zusätzliche Kreisführung für jeweils eine gegenüber der Mittelachse des Exzenters versetzte Achse des anderen Körpers vorgesehen, wobei diese versetzte Achse und die Mittelachse der Kreisführung parallel zur Mittelachse des Exzenters und zur Achse der Exzenterwelle verlaufen und die Schnittpunkte aller vier genannten Achsen mit einer radialen Ebene ein Parallelogramm bilden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/06 (2006.01); F02M 59/10 (2006.01); F04B 1/04 (2006.01); F04B 1/053 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/06 (2013.01); F02M 59/102 (2013.01); F04B 1/0413 (2013.01); F04B 1/053 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19949166 A1 20010426; EP 1098089 A2 20010509; EP 1098089 A3 20020612

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-04-10 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-06-05 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 04B 1/04 A, 7F 04B 1/053 B, 7F 04B 9/04 B

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI