Global Patent Index - EP 1098130 A1

EP 1098130 A1 2001-05-09 - Object supporting device

Title (en)

Object supporting device

Title (de)

Tragvorrichtung zur Abstützung von Gegenständen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support d'objets

Publication

EP 1098130 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00123787 A

Priority

DE 29919619 U

Abstract (en)

The U-shaped support column (4) for the shelf supports and/or functional parts (F) can be pivoted with respect to the rack height axis (9) using bearing journals (7, 8) mounted on the outside of the column arms (5, 5') at their free ends. The shelf supports and/or functional parts are supported by the basis arm (6) of the column.

Abstract (de)

Eine Tragvorrichtung zur Abstützung von Gegenständen ist mit einer U-förmigen, an den freien Enden der U-Schenkel (5,5') abgestützten Tragsäule (4) versehen, die an ihrem Basisschenkel (6) Trag- und/oder Funktionselemente (F) abstützt. Die erfindungsgemäß ausgebildete Tragsäule (4) ist an ihren freien Enden der U-Schenkel (5,5') mittels außenseitiger Lagerzapfen (7,8) um eine Hochachse (9,9') drehbar gelagert. Damit ist die Tragsäule (4) vorteilhaft in einem Schrankkörper (14; 14') so einsetzbar, daß dessen Nutzfläche (N) im Bereich von Stützplatten (23) eine verbesserte Zugänglichkeit aufweist. <IMAGE> <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16M 11/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 49/006 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8811656 U1 19881027

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29919619 U1 20000105; DE 50012903 D1 20060720; EP 1098130 A1 20010509; EP 1098130 B1 20060607

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160902

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-06-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING E.K., 49152 BAD ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50012903

2016-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012903

- Representative's name: BUSSE & BUSSE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTN, DE

2012-07-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING E.K., DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEINRICH J. KESSEBOEHMER KG, 49152 BAD ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50012903

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-07-12 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KESSEBOEHMER HOLDING KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HEINRICH J. KESSEBOEHMER KG, 49152 BAD ESSEN, DE

- Document: DE 50012903

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-07-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 50012903

- Representative's name: BUSSE & BUSSE PATENT- UND RECHTSANWAELTE PARTN, DE

- Effective date: 20120516

2007-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070308

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012903 P 20060720

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE

2004-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041111

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT

2002-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011102

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI