Global Patent Index - EP 1098132 A1

EP 1098132 A1 2001-05-09 - GAS CYLINDER AND METHOD FOR FILLING THE SAME

Title (en)

GAS CYLINDER AND METHOD FOR FILLING THE SAME

Title (de)

GASZYLINDER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN BESCHICKUNG

Title (fr)

BONBONNE DE GAZ ET PROCEDE DE REMPLISSAGE

Publication

EP 1098132 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00925780 A

Priority

  • RU 0000157 W
  • RU 99109668 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6378570B1] A gas cartridge comprises a body 1 with a neck 2. A movable valve made as a ball 3 is disposed inside the body 1. A cap 4 is installed in the neck. The end of the cap 4 can be chamfered or expanded. The ball 3 can be manufactured from an elastic, resilient material, from an elastic, resilient material with a metallic powdered filler or be fully metallic in an elastic, resilient envelope. A method of charging the gas cartridge comprises placing a movable valve inside the body of the cartridge, turning the cartridge with its neck downward and charging the cartridge with a liquefied gas under a pressure, reducing the charging pressure with simultaneous closing of the neck by the movable valve, closing the neck with a cap, pressing-in the cap and welding the flange of the cap to the face of the neck of the cartridge.

Abstract (de)

Die Gasflasche enthält einen Körper 1 mit Hals 2. Innerhalb des Körpers 1 ist ein bewegliches Ventil - eine Kugel 3 - untergebracht. Im Hals ist ein Stopfen 4 eingesetzt, dessen Flansch 5 an der Stirnfläche 6 des Halses 2 angeschweißt ist. Das Ende des Stopfens 4 kann eine Abschrägung aufweisen oder eingewalzt sein. Die Kugel 3 kann aus einem elastischen, federnden Material, aus einem elastischen, federnden Material mit metallischem pulverförmigem Füllstoff oder ganzmetallisch in einer elastischen, federnden Hülle hergestellt sein. Das Verfahren zum Füllen der Gasflasche umfaßt das Unterbringen eines beweglichen Ventile im Inneren des Körpers der Flasche, das Umdrehen der Flasche mit dem Hals nach unten und das Füllen derselben unter Druck mit verflüssigtem Gas, das Vermindern des Fülldrucks unter gleichzeitiger Schließung des Halses mit dem beweglichen Ventil, das Verschließen des Halses mit einem Stopfen, das Einpressen des Stopfens und das Anschweißen des Stopfenflansches an die Stirnfläche des Flaschenhalses. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 5/02 (2006.01); F17C 6/00 (2006.01); F17C 13/04 (2006.01); F17C 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 6/00 (2013.01); F17C 5/02 (2013.01); F17C 13/04 (2013.01); F17C 13/06 (2013.01); F17C 2201/0109 (2013.01); F17C 2203/0617 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0311 (2013.01); F17C 2205/0323 (2013.01); F17C 2209/221 (2013.01); F17C 2209/232 (2013.01); F17C 2221/013 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0123 (2013.01); F17C 2223/0153 (2013.01); F17C 2260/036 (2013.01); F17C 2270/07 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0736 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES

EPO simple patent family

US 6378570 B1 20020430; AT 321236 T 20060415; AU 4441700 A 20001205; DE 50012446 D1 20060511; EP 1098132 A1 20010509; EP 1098132 A4 20050720; EP 1098132 B1 20060322; ES 2257293 T3 20060801; HU 0400881 A2 20040728; HU 225977 B1 20080228; RU 2161282 C1 20001227; WO 0070263 A1 20001123; WO 0070263 A8 20010405; WO 0070263 A8 20010628

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100428

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110704

2011-07-14 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110714

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100427

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2257293 T3

2006-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50012446 P 20060511

2006-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES

2006-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIPACHEV, ALEXEI BORISOVICH

2006-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETROSYAN, ALEKSEI LVOVICH

2006-03-22 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAGNYUKOV, SERGEI ANATOLYEVICH

2005-07-20 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-07-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 17C 13/06 A

2004-07-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSHCHESTVO "GROUP ANICS"

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHIPACHEV, ALEXEI BORISOVICH

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PETROSYAN, ALEXIA LVOVICH

2004-07-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BAGNYUKOV, SERGEI ANATOLIEVICH

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001207

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE