Global Patent Index - EP 1098133 A1

EP 1098133 A1 2001-05-09 - System for storage and delivery of gas

Title (en)

System for storage and delivery of gas

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Gasspeicherung und -abgabe

Title (fr)

Installation de stockage et de délivrance de gaz

Publication

EP 1098133 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420228 A

Priority

FR 9914252 A

Abstract (en)

The stacking system consists of a ring (3) or disc of a synthetic material designed to sit on top of collar sections (5) with supports (6) on one gas bottle and receive the base (7) of a second bottle placed on top of it. The ring is fitted with a housing (27) containing a gas flow regulator and an inverter with control knobs (30, 31), the inverter allowing the gas feed to be switched from an empty gas bottle to a full one stacked on top of it. The housing fits onto a backing plate (26) and has apertures (32) for gas pipes.

Abstract (fr)

Cette installation (1) comprend : au moins deux bouteilles de gaz (2) équipées, à leurs parties supérieures, de structures de gerbage (4), la structure de gerbage (4) d'une bouteille (2) étant conformée pour constituer un siège apte à recevoir le fond (7) d'une autre bouteille (2), avec calage dans le sens radial ; et un détendeur, ainsi qu'éventuellement un appareil dénommé inverseur c'est-à-dire un appareil permettant de basculer d'une première bouteille (2) sur une autre lorsque cette première bouteille (2) est vide ; Selon l'invention, l'installation (1) comprend un support (3) présentant : une première partie (15), conformée sur l'un de ses côtés de manière à pouvoir venir en prise avec la structure de gerbage (4) d'une bouteille (2) et, sur son autre côté, de manière à pouvoir venir en prise avec le fond (7) d'une autre bouteille (2) ; et une deuxième partie (16), solidaire de ladite première partie (15) et faisant saillie radialement de celle-ci, conformée pour recevoir le détendeur et/ou ledit inverseur. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F17C 13/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F17C 13/084 (2013.01); F17C 2270/0745 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098133 A1 20010509; FR 2800842 A1 20010511; FR 2800842 B1 20011214

INPADOC legal status


2007-10-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20070411

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20061130

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010402

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI