Global Patent Index - EP 1098137 A2

EP 1098137 A2 2001-05-09 - Clamping device for a candle

Title (en)

Clamping device for a candle

Title (de)

Spannvorrichtung für eine Kerze

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage pour une bougie

Publication

EP 1098137 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00117903 A

Priority

  • DE 29919357 U
  • DE 20000579 U
  • DE 20009294 U

Abstract (en)

The candle holder consists of an unclosed inner spring unclosed and an outer spring unclosed in its periphery. The springs are leaf springs which are connected at one end, or tangentially in the middle. One spring is wound in tightening fashion inwards as an inner spring. The other spring is wound outwards as an outer spring. The two springs are wound selectively cylindrically or conically or in a combination of these. The two springs are permanently connected together by welding, gluing, or riveting.

Abstract (de)

Eine Spannvorrichtung (1) dient zum Verspannen einer Kerze (2) mit einem Kerzenhalter (3) bzw. Leuchter, so daß auch Kerzen (2) sicher und fest und senkrecht gehalten werden können, deren Durchmesser kleiner als der einer Öffnung (4) des Kerzenhalters (3) ist. Dazu sind zwei Blattfedern (5,6) mit verschiedenen Krümmungsradien aber übereinstimmender Krümmungsrichtung vorgesehen, wobei eine erste Blattfeder (5) mit kleinerem Krümmungsradius durch eine in sie eingesetzte Kerze (2) gegen ihre Federkraft radial nach außen aufgeweitet und somit kraftschlüssig an der Kerze (2) festgelegt wird, während eine zweite Blattfeder (6) mit größerem Krümmungsradius beim Einfügen in die Öffnung (4) des Kerzenhalters oder Leuchters (3) radial nach innen verformbar ist und für die notwendige Klemmkraft gegenüber dem Kerzenhalter oder -leuchter (3) sorgt. Dabei umschließt die zweite Blattfeder (6) die erste Blattfeder (5) mit etwas Abstand, so daß die Spannvorrichtung (1) eine relativ geringe axiale Abmessung hat und in der Regel unsichtbar in der Öffnung (4) des Kerzenhalters oder Leuchters (3) untergebracht werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 35/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 35/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 35/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098137 A2 20010509; EP 1098137 A3 20020102

INPADOC legal status


2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020703

2002-10-24 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI