Global Patent Index - EP 1098146 A2

EP 1098146 A2 2001-05-09 - Air-conditioning duct attenuator

Title (en)

Air-conditioning duct attenuator

Title (de)

Schalldämpfer für Lüftungskanäle einer Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Atténuateur pour gaine de conditionnement d'air

Publication

EP 1098146 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00660194 A

Priority

FI 19992394 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to an attenuator for an air-conditioning duct. The attenuator (10) includes a housing (I) that is made of porous, sound-absorbing and flexible material. In the housing (1), there is provided a number of flow apertures (2; 2<1>, 2<2>, 2<3>) that are parallel to the housing shell (1a), and the shape and measures of the cross-section of the housing (1) are arranged to correspond to those of the air-conditioning duct (4) in which the attenuator (10) should be fitted in, so that its shell (1a) is expanded and compressed against the inner surface (4a) of the air-conditioning duct. In addition, the attenuator (10) comprises a number of plugs (3; 3<1>, 3<3>). The shape and measures of the cross-section of each plug essentially correspond to the respective flow aperture (2; 2<1>, 2<2>, 2<3>) provided in the housing (1), in which the plug in question (3; 3<1>, 3<3>) can be inserted when adjusting the magnitude of the air flow in the air-conditioning duct (4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 13/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/02 (2006.01); F24F 13/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 13/0263 (2013.01); F24F 13/0245 (2013.01); F24F 13/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE DK GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098146 A2 20010509; EP 1098146 A3 20030910; EP 1098146 B1 20060208; EP 1098146 B8 20060503; AT 317534 T 20060215; DE 60025902 D1 20060420; DE 60025902 T2 20060720; DK 1098146 T3 20060410; FI 115794 B 20050715; FI 19992394 A 20010506; NO 20005572 A 20010507; NO 20005572 D0 20001103; NO 318407 B1 20050314

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171116

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20171115

- Year of fee payment: 18

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171117

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121103

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121103

2013-07-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20121103

2013-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 317534 T

- Effective date: 20121103

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101130

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20101129

- Year of fee payment: 11

2010-12-21 [REG SE RPOT] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED WITH A CORRECTED SWEDISH TRANSLATION

2007-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20061109

2006-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60025902 P 20060420

2006-04-10 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2006-03-01 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: JEVEN OY

2006-02-28 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2006-02-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK GB SE

2006-02-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-11-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: JEVEN OY

2004-06-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK GB SE

2004-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040309

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-09-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-09-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 24F 13/24 A

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI