Global Patent Index - EP 1098159 A2

EP 1098159 A2 2001-05-09 - Device for connecting a cartridge magazine to a magazine support in an automatic gun

Title (en)

Device for connecting a cartridge magazine to a magazine support in an automatic gun

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Ankuppeln von Munitionsbehältern an einen Behälterträger einer automatischen Waffe

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour connecter un magasin à cartouches à un support de magasin d'une arme automatique

Publication

EP 1098159 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00118819 A

Priority

DE 19953293 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19953293C1] The coupling device has a munitions container carrier (2) provided with a reception hoop (4) for the munitions container (1) on either side, cooperating with pivot bolts (13) of the latter and unsymmetrically spaced fixing points (7,8) for the munitions container, cooperating with fixing catches (16,17). The pivot bolt seats (5) provided by the reception hoops are spaced from one fixing point to allow the munitions container to hang down at a required angle when the fixing catch cooperating with the other fixing point is released.

Abstract (de)

Um eine einfache Befestigung eines Munitionsbehälters an einer Lafette einer automatischen Waffe herbeizuführen und eine bessere Zugänglichkeit zum Patronengurt für den Be- und Nachladevorgang zu garantieren, so wie die ergonomischen Belastungen für die Befestigung des Munitionsbehälters an der Lafette zu reduzieren, enthält der Behälterträger 2 beidseitig Aufnahmebügel 4 mit einer jeweils nach unten beabstandeten Aufnahme 5 für eine Einhängung und Schwenkbewegung des Munitionsbehälters 1, der dafür mit Lagebolzen 13 ausgestattet ist. In längsaxialer Richtung des Behälterträgers 2 sind unsymmetrisch zu den Aufnahmen 5 beabstandet Befestigungsstellen 7, 8 für den Munitionsbehälter 1 vorgesehen. Der Abstand a zwischen der ersten Befestigungsstelle 7 und der Aufnahme 5 entspricht bei eingehängtem Munitionsbehälter (1) in der Aufnahme (5) dem Abstand zwischen der Aufnahme 5 und einem ersten Arretierungsmittel (16), während die zweite Befestigungsstelle 8 auf dem Behälterträger im Abstand der Länge L des Munitionsbehälters zur ersten Befestigungsstelle angeordnet ist, so daß nach Einhängung des Munitionsbehälters in die Aufnahme 5 und einer Schwenkbewegung um diese Aufnahme 5 eine schräge Beladeposition 9 und in einer zweiten Schwenkbewegung um die erste Befestigungsstelle 7 eine Munitionsentnahmestellung 12 eingenommen werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 9/79

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 9/34 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19953293 C1 20001221; EP 1098159 A2 20010509; EP 1098159 A3 20020626; EP 1098159 B1 20041013; IL 139403 D0 20011125; NO 20004181 A 20010507; NO 20004181 D0 20000822; NO 318826 B1 20050509; US 6393960 B1 20020528

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-03-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50008214

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140821

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120831

2013-05-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130430

2013-04-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120831

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110825

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20110819

- Year of fee payment: 12

2011-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20110901

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080831

2008-01-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070905

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050714

2005-08-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-18 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-01-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-01-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041215

2005-01-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: RHEINMETALL WAFFE MUNITION GMBH

2004-11-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50008214 P 20041118

2004-11-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-10-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2004-10-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-03-19 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT

2002-08-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020523

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI