Global Patent Index - EP 1098180 A1

EP 1098180 A1 2001-05-09 - Apparatus for detecting an amount of displacement

Title (en)

Apparatus for detecting an amount of displacement

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Wegmessung

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour mesurer un déplacement

Publication

EP 1098180 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00121126 A

Priority

DE 19953617 A

Abstract (en)

A probe (1) contacts the component to be monitored under pressure from a spring (6) (or hydraulic cylinder). The spring shares a common guide (5) with the probe. The spring rests on a foot (7) which actuates a flexible membrane (4) linked to strain gauges which, with the aid of electronic circuit (12), convert the membrane deflection into electric signals proportional to the displacement. Sensor is attached to an adapter (10)

Abstract (de)

Eine Vorrichtung zur Wegmessung mit einer mechanischen Tasteinrichtung 1, einem Meßgeber 2 und einer Übertragungseinrichtung 3, welche eine lineare Verschiebung der Tasteinrichtung 1 auf den Meßgeber 2 überträgt, wobei der Meßgeber 2 ein durch die Übertragungseinrichtung 3 verformbares Teil 4 mit einem Sensor aufweist. In bevorzugter Weise wird die Vorrichtung als Getriebeschalter verwendet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01L 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/52 (2006.01); H01H 13/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 13/52 (2013.01); H01H 13/063 (2013.01); H01H 2239/052 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098180 A1 20010509; EP 1098180 B1 20071003; DE 19953617 A1 20010510; DE 50014691 D1 20071115

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160922

- Year of fee payment: 17

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160923

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160928

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160926

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-09-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-05-18 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110420

2008-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080704

2008-06-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-12-18 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2007-11-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50014691 P 20071115

2007-10-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2007-01-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020214

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT NL SE

2001-12-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN NUTZFAHRZEUGE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2001-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBERT SEUFFER GMBH & CO. KG

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT NL SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI