Global Patent Index - EP 1098218 A2

EP 1098218 A2 2001-05-09 - Method for reproducing image signal values

Title (en)

Method for reproducing image signal values

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Wiedergeben von Bildsignalwerten

Title (fr)

Methode pour la reproduction des valeurs des signaux d'image

Publication

EP 1098218 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00123874 A

Priority

DE 19952766 A

Abstract (en)

First digital control signal for pixel corresponds to amendment value. Viewing device provides intermediate value (Rv1,Rv2,Rv3) for pixel which corresponds to altered color value of previous pixel altered by amendment value. Viewing device provides color intermediate value for pixel. First digital control signal of word length N bit is amendment value stored to previous pixel. According to color value of previous image, color graduation is provided according to amendment value of word length, without altering memory space needed by single pixel. All color values for viewing device are provided by altering color value of previous image pixel according to amendment value of current pixel.

Abstract (de)

Verfahren zum Wiedergeben der Bildsignalwerte (R, G, B) der Bildpunkte einer Bildpunktfolge auf einem Sichtgerät (18) mittels digitaler Bildsteuersignale der Wortlänge M Bit über digitale Ansteuersignale der kürzeren Wortlänge N Bit. Gemäß dem Verfahren kann das digitale Ansteuersignal für einen Bildpunkt entweder seinem Bildsignalwert (R, G, B) oder einem Änderungswert (IR) gegenüber dem Bildsignalwert (R, G, B) des vorhergehenden Bildpunktes entsprechen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02F 1/133

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/06 (2006.01); G09G 5/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09G 5/06 (2013.01); G09G 5/39 (2013.01); G09G 2340/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19952766 A1 20010503; EP 1098218 A2 20010509; EP 1098218 A3 20021113

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031020

2003-07-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2002-12-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021023

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-11-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2002-11-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 02F 1/133 A, 7G 09G 5/02 B

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI