Global Patent Index - EP 1098272 A2

EP 1098272 A2 2001-05-09 - An entertainment machine

Title (en)

An entertainment machine

Title (de)

Unterhaltungsautomat

Title (fr)

Machine de divertissement

Publication

EP 1098272 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309810 A

Priority

GB 9926205 A

Abstract (en)

An entertainment machine having associated therewith an input means adapted to allow a first identity, associated with a winning machine result, and a second identity to be input, a control means adapted to control the apparatus, a memory means adapted to store the identities and a pay-out apparatus the control means being adapted to cause the apparatus to require the second identity to be input on a subsequent occasion allowing the identity of the player who entered the first identity to be confirmed and when said first identity has been confirmed said machine being adapted to enter a pay out mode wherein the pay out apparatus is adapted to make an award from the machine. The machine is particularly suitable for playing tournament games in which a prize is paid out a time period after a player has performed his/her prize winning performance. To be accompanied, when published, by Figure 1 of the drawings. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 17/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 17/3248 (2013.01); G07F 17/32 (2013.01); A63F 2300/558 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098272 A2 20010509; EP 1098272 A3 20020703; GB 2356079 A 20010509; GB 2356079 B 20031203; GB 9926205 D0 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2003-10-22 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030104

2003-04-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-07-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-07-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI