Global Patent Index - EP 1098282 A2

EP 1098282 A2 2001-05-09 - Sensor systems

Title (en)

Sensor systems

Title (de)

Sensorsysteme

Title (fr)

Systèmes de capteurs

Publication

EP 1098282 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00309852 A

Priority

GB 9926208 A

Abstract (en)

A sensor system is provided for use in detecting movement of an item, e.g. a picture 16, suspended from a wall or other substantially vertical structure, or for detecting movement of an item displayed or stored on a horizontal or inclined surface, the sensor system including a piezoceramic element (22) which is mounted on a metallic disc (23) which, in use, is located between the item (16) and the structure or surface, and means for detecting the generation of an output by the piezoceramic element (22) as a result of deflection of the disc (23) in either of two opposite directions as a result of movement of the item (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08B 13/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08B 13/14 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098282 A2 20010509; EP 1098282 A3 20020619; GB 0026977 D0 20001220; GB 2360119 A 20010912; GB 2360119 B 20040324; GB 9926208 D0 20000112

INPADOC legal status


2003-09-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021220

2003-04-17 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-03-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2002-06-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI