Global Patent Index - EP 1098286 A2

EP 1098286 A2 2001-05-09 - Method for providing broadcasting program and apparatus for the same

Title (en)

Method for providing broadcasting program and apparatus for the same

Title (de)

Rundfunksverfahren und Vorrichtung dazu

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la radiodiffusion et appareil

Publication

EP 1098286 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00250369 A

Priority

JP 31439499 A

Abstract (en)

An apparatus and method are provided for broadcasting a CM a minimum number of times at a specified interval, which is guaranteed to a sponsor, even when the CM would not meet tastes of a user or would not be fully suitable to conditions of time and/or places on a user side. A broadcasting program providing apparatus to provide a broadcasting program in a manner to match conditions on a program receiving user who is in a changing state is composed of a broadcasting program storing section (1) having an attribute value storing sectionn (2), a previous broadcast time storing section (3), a broadcasting interval storing section (4), a broadcasting interval storing section (5) and a matching degree storing section (6), wherein the difference between a date and/or time when a program was broadcast last time and a present date and/or time is compared with a value stored in the broadcasting interval storing section (4) for each broadcasting program and a weight is calculated based on a difference and a value obtained by multiplying the calculated weight by a value output from an attribute matching degree calculating section (9) is stored in the matching degree storing section (6). (Fig. 1) <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/09; H04H 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04N 7/08 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G08G 1/09 (2006.01); H04B 1/16 (2006.01); H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04H 20/62 (2008.01); H04N 7/081 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/62 (2013.01); G08G 1/093 (2013.01); G08G 1/091 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098286 A2 20010509; EP 1098286 A3 20011121; JP 2001136135 A 20010518

INPADOC legal status


2004-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040331

2002-08-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011218

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-11-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-11-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08G 1/09 A, 7H 04H 1/00 B, 7G 06F 17/60 B

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI