Global Patent Index - EP 1098345 A1

EP 1098345 A1 2001-05-09 - Electric fuse

Title (en)

Electric fuse

Title (de)

Elektrische Sicherung

Title (fr)

Fusible électrique

Publication

EP 1098345 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00119643 A

Priority

DE 19952793 A

Abstract (en)

The fuse has a wire or strip metal or metal alloy melting conductor in an insulating body and with a quotient of resistance at melting temperature to resistance at room temperature of at least 8. The ratio can be at least 15 and the melting temperature is greater than 1100 degrees C. The temperature coefficient of the specific resistance in the range from room temperature to melting temperature is greater than or equal to 4.2x10<->3. The fuse has a melting conductor (13) made of wire or strip metal or metal alloy in an insulating body (10). The material of the melting conductor has a quotient of resistance at the melting temperature to the resistance at room temperature of at least 8. Alternatively, the ratio can be at least 15 and the melting temperature is greater than 100 degrees C. The temperature coefficient of the specific resistance in the temperature range from room temperature to the melting temperature is greater than or equal to 4.2x10<->3.

Abstract (de)

Die beschriebene elektrische Hochspannungssicherung dient dem Absichern von an das elektrische Energienetz angekoppelten Schwachstromeinrichtungen. Die elektrische Sicherung weist einen in einem Isolierkörper (10) angeordneten Schmelzleiter (13) aus Draht oder Bandmaterial aus Metall oder einer Metallegierung auf. Um bei kleineren Abmessungen und preiswerteren Ausführungen eine hohe Strombegrenzung, insbesondere vor Entstehung des Lichtbogens, zu erreichen, ist erfindungsgemäß vorgesehen, daß das Material des Schmelzleiters (13) einen Quotienten (Q) aus Widerstand bei Schmelztemperatur (Rs) und Widerstand bei Raumtemperatur (RK) hat, der wenigstens 8 ist (Q = Rs/RK >= 8) <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/06 (2006.01); H01H 85/042 (2006.01); H01H 85/157 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/06 (2013.01); H01H 85/042 (2013.01); H01H 85/157 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098345 A1 20010509; DE 19952793 A1 20010510

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-09 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050401

2005-04-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KLEMME, THOMAS

2005-04-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BESSEI, HERBERT, DR.-ING.

2005-04-20 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HABEREY, P.M. FLORIAN, PROF. DR.-ING.

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20010817

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EFEN GMBH

2001-10-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010817

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI