Global Patent Index - EP 1098391 A2

EP 1098391 A2 2001-05-09 - Folded dipole antenna

Title (en)

Folded dipole antenna

Title (de)

Faltdipolantenne

Title (fr)

Antenne doublet replié

Publication

EP 1098391 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123425 A

Priority

  • US 43252499 A
  • US 47948900 A

Abstract (en)

A folded dipole antenna for transmitting and receiving electromagnetic signals is provided. The antenna includes a ground plane and a conductor extending adjacent the ground plane and spaced therefrom by a first dielectric. The conductor includes an open-ended transmission line stub, a radiator input section, at least one radiating section integrally formed with the radiator input section, and a feed section. The radiating section includes first and second ends, a fed dipole and a passive dipole. The fed dipole is connected to the radiator input section. The passive dipole is disposed in spaced relation to the fed dipole to form a gap. The passive dipole is shorted to the fed dipole at the first and second ends. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/26; H01Q 1/24; H01Q 19/10; H01Q 21/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 9/26 (2006.01); H01Q 19/10 (2006.01); H01Q 21/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 21/062 (2013.01); H01Q 1/246 (2013.01); H01Q 9/26 (2013.01); H01Q 19/108 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR GB SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098391 A2 20010509; EP 1098391 A3 20030514; EP 1098391 B1 20050126; AU 6965600 A 20010510; AU 778969 B2 20041223; BR 0005243 A 20010619; CN 1169387 C 20040929; CN 1298265 A 20010606; DE 60017674 D1 20050303; DE 60017674 T2 20051229; DK 1098391 T3 20050404; MX PA00010804 A 20030425

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-10-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-10-04 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60017674

- Effective date: 20120601

2012-07-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-09-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-08-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110801

2011-06-28 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2011-03-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20101124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2011-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-07-19 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2010-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20091201

- Year of fee payment: 10

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-01-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20081114

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-01-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-12-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-05-10 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-04-04 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2005-03-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60017674 P 20050303

2005-02-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2005-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2005-01-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-02-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR GB SE

2004-01-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031205

2004-01-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20031112

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-05-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI