Global Patent Index - EP 1098398 A2

EP 1098398 A2 2001-05-09 - Connector module retainer especially suitable for wafer connectors and connector assembly utilizing same

Title (en)

Connector module retainer especially suitable for wafer connectors and connector assembly utilizing same

Title (de)

Verbindungsmodul mit Verriegelung, insbesondere geeignet für plattenartige Verbinder und Verbinderzusammenbau mit einer solchen Verriegelung

Title (fr)

Verrouillage pour connecteurs modulaires spécialement adapté pour des connecteurs du type plaquette et assemblage de connecteurs utisant un tel verrouillage

Publication

EP 1098398 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123775 A

Priority

  • US 43341299 A
  • US 51513300 A

Abstract (en)

A retainer and connector system serves to reliably hold together and align a series of thin connector modules (21), such as wafer connectors, into an overall unit formed from the individual connector modules. The side edges of each of the connector modules (21) have a pair of cavities (40, 41) formed therein. A retainer member (100) is provided having a length (L) equal to the thickness (WT) of the connector unit. The retainer member (100) has two opposing ends (106, 107), each with first and second engagement members disposed thereon. The first engagement members (106) are inserted into the first engagement cavities (40) and rotated toward the connector modules until the second engagement members (107) enter and engage the second engagement cavities (41). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/514; H01R 13/518

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/514 (2006.01); H01R 13/518 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/518 (2013.01); H01R 13/514 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098398 A2 20010509; EP 1098398 A3 20030416; EP 1098398 B1 20070110; DE 60032856 D1 20070222; DE 60032856 T2 20071025; JP 2001313112 A 20011109; JP 3433253 B2 20030804

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60032856

- Effective date: 20110531

2011-08-11 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 60032856

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091101

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20091127

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081125

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20071011

2007-08-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-02-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032856 P 20070222

2007-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2007-01-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2004-01-07 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030712

2003-04-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2003-04-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI