Global Patent Index - EP 1098401 A1

EP 1098401 A1 2001-05-09 - Plug or socket

Title (en)

Plug or socket

Title (de)

Stecker oder Buchse

Title (fr)

Prise mâle ou femelle

Publication

EP 1098401 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00309632 A

Priority

  • US 43277899 A
  • CN 99122224 A
  • JP 32276299 A
  • CN 99249485 U

Abstract (en)

Plug or socket structured integral with electromagnetic noise signal inhibition device, to which is mounted magnetic ring by means of conductor or conduction pin, or conduction reed which is associated with the plug assembly or the socket assembly, on both the power side and the load side of the conductor or conduction pin or conduction reed linked to the magnetic ring as established is respectively connected in parallel filter capacitor to form a two-way filter ckt., and that optionally incorporating a surge absorbent element still parallel therewith, integrally structured with both the plug assembly and the socket assembly.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/719

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/00 (2006.01); H01R 13/648 (2006.01); H01R 13/66 (2006.01); H01R 13/719 (2011.01); H02H 9/00 (2006.01); H02H 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/719 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] DE 29621936 U1 19970911 - SHIN JIUH CORP [TW]
  • [XY] DE 3148351 A1 19820722 - SHARP KK [JP]
  • [Y] GB 2153165 A 19850814 - AVX CORP
  • [X] PAULUS E J: "SURGE/NOISE SUPPRESSION WITHIN ELECTRICAL CONNECTORS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS AND TECHNOLOGY CONFERENCE,US,NEW YORK, IEEE, vol. CONF. 44, 1 May 1994 (1994-05-01), pages 239 - 247, XP000479153, ISBN: 0-7803-0914-6

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098401 A1 20010509; CN 1295362 A 20010516; CN 2400922 Y 20001011; JP 2001143822 A 20010525

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-28 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030508

2002-01-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011109

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI