Global Patent Index - EP 1098497 A2

EP 1098497 A2 2001-05-09 - Acoustic echo suppression mechanism for a portable radio apparatus

Title (en)

Acoustic echo suppression mechanism for a portable radio apparatus

Title (de)

Mechanismus zur akustischen Echounterdrückung für ein Funkgerät

Title (fr)

Mécanisme de suppression d'écho acoustique pour un appareil radio portable

Publication

EP 1098497 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00123157 A

Priority

JP 30459699 A

Abstract (en)

The body of portable radio apparatus is composed of a cover 11 and a case 12, and an I/O connector 14 provided on a printed circuit board 13 is sandwiched between the cover 11 and the case 12. Onto the cover 11 is attached a transmitter (microphone) 15 provided on the printed circuit board 13 and the cover 11 is provided with a mouthpiece 16. The case 12 is provided with a battery receiver 17 for receiving batteries 18. The side of the I/O connector 14 facing the case 12 and the side of the I/O connector 14 facing the cover 11 are provided with ribs 19 and the case 12 and the cover 11 are provided with recesses 20, 21 to receive the ribs and further the side of the case 12 facing the external terminal 29 of the I/O connector and the side of the cover 11 facing the external terminal 29 of the I/O connector are provided with ribs 22, 23. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/02; H04M 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05K 7/02 (2006.01); H04B 1/38 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04M 1/20 (2006.01); H04W 88/02 (2009.01); H05K 5/02 (2006.01); H05K 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/20 (2013.01); H04M 1/0262 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098497 A2 20010509; EP 1098497 A3 20031001; EP 1098497 B1 20061213; CN 1200582 C 20050504; CN 1303222 A 20010711; DE 60032319 D1 20070125; DE 60032319 T2 20070329; JP 2001127455 A 20010511; KR 20010051269 A 20010625

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091025

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081022

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081023

- Year of fee payment: 9

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-11-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070914

2007-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-03-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070313

2007-01-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60032319 P 20070125

2006-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL SE

2006-12-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2006-12-13 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2006-12-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061213

2004-06-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB NL SE

2004-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040428

2004-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20040325

2003-10-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-10-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI