Global Patent Index - EP 1098549 A2

EP 1098549 A2 2001-05-09 - Electroacoustic transducer

Title (en)

Electroacoustic transducer

Title (de)

Elektroakustischer Wandler

Title (fr)

Transducteur électroacoustique

Publication

EP 1098549 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00890328 A

Priority

  • AT 187199 A
  • AT 942000 A

Abstract (en)

The transducer has a diaphragm (4) mounted on a holding ring (6), and an attached coil (5) with supply wires. The supply wires comprises a common or respective holding parts in the region of the holding ring. The holding part(s) is/are attached to the holding ring. The holding parts are made of electrically insulating plastics, e.g. in the form of an adhesive tape, and are arranged in a recess (12) in the holding ring. An Independent claim is included for manufacturing an electroacoustic transducer.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen elektroakustischen Wandler mit einer an einem Haltering (6) montierten Membrane (4) und einer daran befestigten Spule (5) mit Versorgungsdrähten. Die Erfindung ist dadurch gekennzeichnet, daß die Versorgungsdrähte im Bereich des Halteringes (6) gemeinsam oder jeweils einzeln einen Halteteil (7) aufweisen, und daß der Halteteil (7) am Haltering (6) befestigt ist. Die Erfindung betrifft auch Ausgestaltungen. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04R 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04R 9/02 (2006.01); H04R 7/18 (2006.01); H04R 9/04 (2006.01); H04R 31/00 (2006.01); H04R 9/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04R 31/006 (2013.01); H04R 1/06 (2013.01); H04R 9/06 (2013.01); H04R 2499/11 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1098549 A2 20010509; EP 1098549 A3 20051207; AT 411558 B 20040225; AT A942000 A 20030715; JP 2001169388 A 20010622

INPADOC legal status


2007-03-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060608

2006-09-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2006-08-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2005-12-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2005-12-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR

2001-05-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI