Global Patent Index - EP 1098575 A1

EP 1098575 A1 2001-05-16 - TEXTILE COMPLEX FOR MAKING CLOTHES FOR PROTECTION AGAINST HEAT

Title (en)

TEXTILE COMPLEX FOR MAKING CLOTHES FOR PROTECTION AGAINST HEAT

Title (de)

TEXTILVERBUNDMATERIAL ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON WÄRMESCHUTZKLEIDUNGSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

COMPLEXE TEXTILE POUR LA REALISATION DE VETEMENTS DE PROTECTION THERMIQUE

Publication

EP 1098575 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99932966 A

Priority

  • FR 9901822 W
  • FR 9809582 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2781341A1] The material consists of an outer layer of nonflammable fabric and an inner lining for comfort and hygiene, with a series of ribs on the inner surface of the outer layer and/or the outer surface of the lining to form air-filled channels. The material consists of an outer layer (2) of a nonflammable fabric and an inner lining (4) for comfort and hygiene, with a series of ribs (5) on the inner surface of the outer layer and/or the outer surface of the lining to form air-filled channels. The ribs can be continuous or discontinuous and are made from a material with low compressibility under the effect of heat, such as thermostable fibers in bundles attached to the lining by its yarn filaments during manufacture. The ribs are preferably 1 - 10 mm thick and 2 - 15 mm apart and run in a generally lengthwise direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41D 31/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 13/00 (2006.01); A41D 31/00 (2006.01); B32B 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 31/0027 (2013.01); A41D 2400/20 (2013.01); A41D 2400/22 (2013.01); A41D 2400/62 (2013.01); Y10S 428/92 (2013.01); Y10T 428/24562 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0004798A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2781341 A1 20000128; FR 2781341 B1 20001020; AT 240057 T 20030515; AU 4916599 A 20000214; AU 747771 B2 20020523; BR 9912340 A 20010417; CA 2338177 A1 20000203; CA 2338177 C 20081216; DE 69907914 D1 20030618; DE 69907914 T2 20040115; DE 69907914 T3 20070830; DK 1098575 T3 20030915; DK 1098575 T4 20070611; EP 1098575 A1 20010516; EP 1098575 B1 20030514; EP 1098575 B2 20070509; ES 2196833 T3 20031216; ES 2196833 T5 20071116; JP 2002521576 A 20020716; NO 20010335 A 20010319; NO 20010335 D0 20010119; NZ 509416 A 20031031; PT 1098575 E 20030731; TR 200100215 T2 20010621; US 6481015 B1 20021119; WO 0004798 A1 20000203

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170713

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170809

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170712

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20170616

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170623

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170619

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-01 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-11-16 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2007-08-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2007-07-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20070401881

2007-07-02 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-05-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2007-05-30 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2007-05-29 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2007-05-09 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20070509

2007-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2007-01-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PROLINE TEXTILE

2006-10-25 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: PROLINE TEXTILE

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2196833 T3

2003-11-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: PROLINE TEXTILE

2003-11-03 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: EUROPROTECT FRANCE SA

2003-09-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403022

2003-09-17 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PROLINE TEXTILE

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-09-15 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-09-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-09-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: EUROPROTECT FRANCE SA

2003-07-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-23 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030723

2003-07-23 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EUROPROTECT FRANCE SA

2003-06-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69907914 P 20030618

2003-06-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-06-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030515

2003-05-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *EUROPROTECT FRANCE S.A.6 RUE JEAN VIRIOT, F-88000

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-05-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: *EUROPROTECT FRANCE S.A.

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-05-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2003-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EUROPROTECT FRANCE

2002-01-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011129

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010109

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE