Global Patent Index - EP 1098659 A2

EP 1098659 A2 2001-05-16 - LIBRARIES OF POLYHYDROXAMATES AND THEIR ANALOGS

Title (en)

LIBRARIES OF POLYHYDROXAMATES AND THEIR ANALOGS

Title (de)

POLYHYDROXAMATBANKEN UND IHRE ANALOGA

Title (fr)

BANQUES DE POLYHYDROXAMATES ET LEURS ANALOGUES

Publication

EP 1098659 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99937465 A

Priority

  • US 9916848 W
  • US 9388398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0004868A2] A method of synthesizing desired polyhydroxamates and polyhydroxamate analogs is provided. The method comprises linking a first component of the desired polyhydroxamate or polyhydroxamate analog to a support matrix under conditions effective to form a first matrix-bound intermediate of said desired polyhydroxamate or analog, extending said first matrix-bound intermediate using reagents and reaction conditions effective to form one or more additional matrix-bound intermediates of said desired polyhydroxamate or analog, thereby forming a matrix-bound precursor of the desired polyhydroxamate or polyhydroxamate analog. Protective groups used during synthesis of the precursor are removed and the matrix-bound precursor is cleared from the support matrix, thereby synthesizing the desired polyhydroxamate or polyhydroxamate analog. Methods of making, screening and selecting libraries of candidate polyhydroxamates, the libraries and polyhydroxamates, polyhydroxamate analogs, their intermediates, and methods for using such compounds and their compositions are also disclosed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 38/00; C07C 233/00; C07C 239/00; C07C 241/00; C07C 255/00; C07C 259/04; C07C 259/06; C07K 5/00; G01N 33/53; G01N 33/543; G01N 33/566; G01N 33/567

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); A61K 31/16 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 49/04 (2006.01); A61K 51/00 (2006.01); A61P 7/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/10 (2006.01); A61P 15/06 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/24 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 39/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07C 259/06 (2006.01); C07K 5/00 (2006.01); C08L 101/00 (2006.01); G01N 33/15 (2006.01); G01N 33/566 (2006.01); C07B 61/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 259/06 (2013.01); C07B 2200/11 (2013.01); C40B 40/00 (2013.01); Y02P 20/55 (2015.11)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0004868 A2 20000203; WO 0004868 A3 20000504; AU 5229599 A 20000214; CA 2337756 A1 20000203; EP 1098659 A2 20010516; EP 1098659 A4 20041124; JP 2002521319 A 20020716

INPADOC legal status


2008-02-29 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1038178

2006-04-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050924

2005-06-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050513

2004-11-24 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20041011

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7A 61K 38/00 A

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/53 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/567 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/566 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7G 01N 33/543 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07K 5/00 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 233/00 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 239/00 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 241/00 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 255/00 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 259/04 B

2004-09-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7C 07C 259/06 B

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MARSHALL, GARLAND, R.

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSIK, LEONARD, O.

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHALL, OTTO, F.

2001-09-12 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SLOMCZYNSKA, URSZULA, J.

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI