Global Patent Index - EP 1098667 A4

EP 1098667 A4 2002-09-11 - CHELATING SYSTEMS FOR USE IN THE DELIVERY OF COMPOUNDS TO CELLS

Title (en)

CHELATING SYSTEMS FOR USE IN THE DELIVERY OF COMPOUNDS TO CELLS

Title (de)

CHELATBILDENDE SYSTEME FÜR DIE VERABREICHUNG VON SUBSTANZEN IN ZELLEN.

Title (fr)

SYSTEMES CHELATEURS SERVANT A ACHEMINER DES COMPOSES JUSQU'AUX CELLULES

Publication

EP 1098667 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99935616 A

Priority

  • US 9916095 W
  • US 9323098 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0003738A1] Chelator containing compounds are utilized in the delivery of molecules, polymers, nucleic acids and genes to animal cells. At least one chelator such as crown ether is attached to a polymer and then associated with another polymer such as DNA. An ion is then added to the mixture thereby forming condensed DNA. In condensed form and in complex with the chelator, DNA can be delivered to a cell.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00; C12N 15/87

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/00 (2006.01); C12N 15/87 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/0025 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01); C12N 15/87 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] WO 9524929 A2 19950921 - UNIV BROWN RES FOUND [US]
  • [X] WO 9423738 A1 19941027 - MEDISORB TECHNOLOGIES INTERNAT [US]
  • [PX] WO 9929304 A1 19990617 - MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US]
  • [A] KABANOV A V ET AL: "DNA COMPLEXES WITH POLYCATIONS FOR THE DELIVERY OF GENETIC MATERIAL INTO CELLS", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, vol. 6, no. 1, 1995, pages 7 - 20, XP000494803, ISSN: 1043-1802
  • [A] KATAYOSE S ET AL: "WATER-SOLUBLE POLYION COMPLEX ASSOCIATES OF DNA AND POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL)-POLY(L-LYSINE) BLOCK COPOLYMER", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, vol. 8, no. 5, 1 September 1997 (1997-09-01), pages 702 - 707, XP000698649, ISSN: 1043-1802
  • [A] WOLFERT M A ET AL: "CHARACTERIZATION OF VECTORS FOR GENE THERAPY FORMED BY SELF-ASSEMBLY OF DNA WITH SYNTHETIC BLOCK CO-POLYMERS", HUMAN GENE THERAPY, XX, XX, vol. 7, no. 17, 10 November 1996 (1996-11-10), pages 2123 - 2133, XP002060059, ISSN: 1043-0342
  • See also references of WO 0003738A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 0003738 A1 20000127; EP 1098667 A1 20010516; EP 1098667 A4 20020911; US 2004197318 A1 20041007; US 6818626 B1 20041116

INPADOC legal status


2006-08-02 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060201

2003-11-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20031007

2002-09-11 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20020731

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 48/00 A, 7C 12N 15/87 B

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010214

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI