Global Patent Index - EP 1098672 A1

EP 1098672 A1 2001-05-16 - BALLOON JACK

Title (en)

BALLOON JACK

Title (de)

ALS BALLON AUSGEBILDETER, INTERVERTEBRALER SEPARATOR

Title (fr)

SEPARATEUR A BALLONNET

Publication

EP 1098672 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99924363 A

Priority

  • US 9911084 W
  • US 8589698 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9959669A1] The invention relates to an inflatable balloon catheter (10) called a balloon jack, which serves to distract vertebral bodies (17, 18) or other anatomical structure at the site of an implant or other surgical procedure. The device is an alternative to a standard intervertebral body separator. It is designed to minimize damage to the cortical endplates during distraction. The balloon jack (10) is fabricated from non-compliant polyethylene terephthalate (PET), commonly used in urology, and cardiology balloon catheters. In addition, the balloon jack (10) may be used to separate other structures including bone at locations throughout the body.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 29/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/02 (2006.01); A61B 17/00 (2006.01); A61F 2/958 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 17/025 (2013.01); A61B 2017/00557 (2013.01); A61B 2017/0256 (2013.01); A61M 25/10 (2013.01); A61M 25/1002 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9959669 A1 19991125; AU 4088399 A 19991206; EP 1098672 A1 20010516; EP 1098672 A4 20040317

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-13 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20090721

2009-02-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090109

2008-12-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010222

2007-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WARSAW ORTHOPEDIC, INC.

2005-12-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SDGI HOLDINGS, INC.

2005-12-14 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRYAN, VINCENT

2004-03-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040203

2001-07-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61B 17/02 A

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE