Global Patent Index - EP 1098694 A1

EP 1098694 A1 2001-05-16 - METHOD FOR REGENERATING AN NOx STORAGE CATALYST

Title (en)

METHOD FOR REGENERATING AN NOx STORAGE CATALYST

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR REGENERATION EINES NOx-SPEICHERKATALYSATORS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE REGENERATION D'UN CATALYSEUR ACCUMULATEUR DE NOx

Publication

EP 1098694 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99942726 A

Priority

  • DE 9901907 W
  • DE 19830829 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19830829C1] A criterion for determining whether the quantity of a regeneration agent being supplied to the NOx storage catalyst in a regeneration phase must be modified in order to achieve optimum efficiency of the emissions control system is derived from the time characteristic of the output signal (US) of a measuring sensor connected downstream of the NOx storage catalyst, during and after the regeneration phase. Said output signal (US) is picked off on two electrodes on the amperometric NOx measuring sensor and shows the two-point behaviour which is necessary for the method.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B01D 53/94; F01N 3/08; F02D 41/02; G01N 27/49

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 27/419 (2006.01); B01D 53/86 (2006.01); F01N 3/18 (2006.01); F01N 3/20 (2006.01); F01N 3/24 (2006.01); F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/04 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 45/00 (2006.01); F01N 3/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 3/0842 (2013.01); F02D 41/0275 (2013.01); F02D 41/1454 (2013.01); F02D 41/146 (2013.01); F02D 41/1463 (2013.01); F01N 2570/04 (2013.01); Y10T 436/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0002648A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19830829 C1 19990408; EP 1098694 A1 20010516; EP 1098694 B1 20040310; JP 2002520530 A 20020709; US 2001002539 A1 20010607; US 6385966 B2 20020514; WO 0002648 A1 20000120

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140201

2014-04-24 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59908818

- Effective date: 20140201

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20120731

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090731

2010-04-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-03-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090701

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080722

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080715

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-03-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041213

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-04-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908818 P 20040415

2004-04-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-12-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021016

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE